This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 06:01:24 (UTC).

MARK ANDERSON VS C & H SUGAR COMPANY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/31/2009 MARK ANDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C H SUGAR COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN A. KRONSTADT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9055

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN A. KRONSTADT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANDERSON MARK

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Respondents

BRUNTON ENTERPRISES INC

BRUNTON ENTERPRISES INC. (DOE 1)

C & H SUGAR COMPANY INC.

DOES 1 TO 40

DOMINO SUGAR INC.

PLAS-TAL STEEL CONSTRUCTION

REINRAG CONSULTING INTERNATIONAL INC(DOE2

BRUNTON ENTERPRISES INC. DOE 1

REINRAG CONSULTING INTERNATIONAL INCDOE2

REINRAG CONSULTING INT'L INC. (DIS)

REINRAG CONSULTING INT'L INC. DIS

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BRUNTON ENTERPRISES INC. (DOE 1)

DOES 1 TO 40

PLAS-TAL STEEL CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WELTIN PHILIP R. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CAMMARANO DENNIS A. LAW O/O

COGSWELL FORREST R. ESQ.

LABAT KAREN M. ESQ.

WINDHAM TIMOTHY RAY ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Brunton Enterprises, Inc. (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party); Plas-Tal Steel Construction (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Reinrag Consulting Int'l, Inc. (DIS) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by Brunton Enterprises, Inc. (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party); Plas-Tal Steel Construction (DISMISSED) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Mark Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mark Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & H Sugar Company Inc California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BRUNTON ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN SUGAR REFINING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COGSWELL FORREST R. ESQ.