This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 01:53:16 (UTC).

MARJORIE WEBB VS. FERHAT HANACI; MARION L. TUTT

Case Summary

On 02/25/2011 MARJORIE WEBB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FERHAT HANACI MARION L TUTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, GAIL FEUER, JOSEPH DE VANON, MARY THORNTON HOUSE, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6901

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

GAIL FEUER

JOSEPH DE VANON

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB MARJORIE

Defendants

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

DBA MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 500

FERHAT CONSTRUCTION INC.

HANACI FERHAT

TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES INC.;

TUTT MARION L.

MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES

MACGREGOR & BERTHEL

SNYDER LAW LLP

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY THE LAW OFFICES

Not Classified By Court

HOSP F. PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSSI WENDI

ROSSI WENDY LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

SNYDER LAW LLP

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY THE LAW OFFICES

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

MACGREGOR & BERTHEL

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES

5/2/2013: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES

DECLARATION OF R. TIMOTHY O?CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, THE MSC, THE FSC AND ALL PRETRIAL DATES AND TO HAVE MSJ HEARD WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF TRIAL

5/2/2013: DECLARATION OF R. TIMOTHY O?CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, THE MSC, THE FSC AND ALL PRETRIAL DATES AND TO HAVE MSJ HEARD WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF TRIAL

PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO EXPARTE REQUESTS TO CONTINUE TRIAL & SHORTEN NOTICE FOR A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/2/2013: PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO EXPARTE REQUESTS TO CONTINUE TRIAL & SHORTEN NOTICE FOR A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MINUTE ORDER

5/2/2013: MINUTE ORDER

DECLARATION OF R. TIMOTHY O?CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

6/5/2013: DECLARATION OF R. TIMOTHY O?CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DECLARATION OF GLEN DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

6/5/2013: DECLARATION OF GLEN DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

6/5/2013: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

6/6/2013: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

DECLARATION OF MARION TUTT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

6/6/2013: DECLARATION OF MARION TUTT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. ROTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

6/6/2013: DECLARATION OF RICHARD S. ROTH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL TO OCTOBER 28, 2013 AND RELATED CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TR1AL DATES

7/8/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL TO OCTOBER 28, 2013 AND RELATED CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TR1AL DATES

DECLARATION OF R. TIMOTHY O?CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, THE FSC AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES

7/10/2013: DECLARATION OF R. TIMOTHY O?CONNOR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, THE FSC AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES, EX PARTE APPLICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/10/2013: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DATES, EX PARTE APPLICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL PRETRIAL DATES

7/12/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL PRETRIAL DATES

NOTICE OF SETTLENT OF ENTIRE CASE AT TIME OF V.S.C.

8/8/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLENT OF ENTIRE CASE AT TIME OF V.S.C.

Minute Order -

8/14/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT?S, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.?S

8/16/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTT?S, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.?S

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

8/23/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Osc Re Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA93, Gail Feuer, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal (AFTER SETTLEMENT) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARJORIE WEBB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ENTIRE COMPLAINT FILED BY MARJORIE WEBB AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION CONTAINED IN THAT COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: DEFT. ALLSTATE INS CO'S MSJ OF ISSUES ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; DEFENDANTS MARION L. TUTTS, MARION TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, AND TUTT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND ORDER SETTING OSC RE: SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 93; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2011
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARJORIE WEBB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (RE DOE 1 FERHAT CONSTRUCTION, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by MARJORIE WEBB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department A, MARY THORNTON HOUSE, Presiding; Notice - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketCCP 170.6 Filed Against Judge; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARJORIE WEBB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less