This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 00:55:20 (UTC).

MARIE DE WEESE PETTIBONE VS MARC R LUSSIER MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2015 MARIE DE WEESE PETTIBONE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MARC R LUSSIER MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2608

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PETTIBONE MARIE DE WEESE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

LUSSIER MARC R. M.D.

TOWN CENTER PLASTIC SUGERY

LUSSIER MARC R. M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN R. CONTOS

CONTOS JOHN RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

DOUGLAS JOEL BRUCE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE THE INSURANCE LIQUIDATION STAY ORDER ISSUED BY THE SOUTH CAROLINA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS

1/5/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE THE INSURANCE LIQUIDATION STAY ORDER ISSUED BY THE SOUTH CAROLINA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

2/2/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

DECLARATION OF DEREK F. O'REILLY-JONES RE: STATUS OF THE OUT OF STATE INSURANCE LIQUIDATION

9/21/2018: DECLARATION OF DEREK F. O'REILLY-JONES RE: STATUS OF THE OUT OF STATE INSURANCE LIQUIDATION

Declaration

6/4/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

6/10/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

2/13/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

DEFENDANT MARC R. LUSSIER, M.D.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

3/21/2016: DEFENDANT MARC R. LUSSIER, M.D.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF MARC R. LUSSIER WITH CORRECTED ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

3/22/2016: NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF MARC R. LUSSIER WITH CORRECTED ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, DESIGNATION, MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE CHARLES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/23/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, DESIGNATION, MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE CHARLES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF RULING

3/30/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL- RELATED DATES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO EXPERT DESIGNATION, MOTION AND DISCO VERY C UL OFF DATE S; ETC.

11/4/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TRIAL- RELATED DATES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO EXPERT DESIGNATION, MOTION AND DISCO VERY C UL OFF DATE S; ETC.

Minute Order

11/4/2016: Minute Order

ORDER RE: (1) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; ETC

12/2/2016: ORDER RE: (1) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; ETC

Minute Order

12/16/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

12/19/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

4/7/2017: ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473(B); ETC

10/2/2017: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 473(B); ETC

ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

11/2/2017: ORDER RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (ReStatus of Liquidation Proceedings Oceanus Ins Co Risk Retention Group, Inc.) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Re: Status of Liquidation P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Declaration (of Derek F. O'reilly-Jones); Filed by Lussier, Marc R., M.D. (Dismissed 4/7/17) (Defendant); Town Center Plastic Sugery (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DEREK F. O'REILLY-JONES RE: STATUS OF THE OUT OF STATE INSURANCE LIQUIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Lussier, Marc R., M.D. (Dismissed 4/7/17) (Defendant); Town Center Plastic Sugery (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL, DESIGNATION, MOTION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE CHARLES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Notice of Filing; Filed by Lussier, Marc R., M.D. (Dismissed 4/7/17) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF MARC R. LUSSIER WITH CORRECTED ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DEFENDANT MARC R. LUSSIER, M.D.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Lussier, Marc R., M.D. (Dismissed 4/7/17) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DEFENDANT, MARC R. LUSSIER, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Lussier, Marc R., M.D. (Dismissed 4/7/17) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Marie De Weese Pettibone (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC572608    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 4A

On October 8, 2019, the Court continued the hearing on its Order to Show Cause re: Status of Liquidation Proceedings of Oceanus Ins. Co. Risk Retention Group, Inc., to December 6, 2019.   With regard to the current stay of the case, the Court directed Plaintiff to reserve a hearing for December 6, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. for any motion that might be filed to terminate the stay.  In the interim, Plaintiff apparently reserved a hearing for the motion to terminate the stay on January 24, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.  To avoid needless appearances in this case, the Court continues the hearing on its OSC re: status of liquidation proceedings to January 24, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. to be heard along with any motion to terminate stay that may be filed by Plaintiff.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of the Court's ruling.