This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:59:50 (UTC).

MARICELA FIGUERA ET AL VS JUANITA DEL CARMEN MORALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/16/2016 MARICELA FIGUERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUANITA DEL CARMEN MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0806

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AYALA MERCEDES

ALVAREZ CRUZ

FIGUERA MARICELA

Defendants and Respondents

MORALES JUANITA DEL CARMEN

DOES

PACOIMA PLAZA SHOPPING CENTER LLC

PACOIMA PLAZA SHOPPING CENTER

LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EVERARDO VARGAS VALENCIA

Defendant Attorneys

GETTY WILLIAM C.

HARRISON COLIN M.

GMELICH THOMAS PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/30/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/11/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

7/17/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

Summons

8/1/2018: Summons

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

8/31/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/9/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

10/16/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/28/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

2/5/2019: Minute Order

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/16/2016: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

8/18/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/18/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/18/2016: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/6/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Status Conference (ReProof of Service as to Defendant, Juanita Del Carmen Morales) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Proof of Service as to Defendant, Juani...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Answer; Filed by JUanita Del Carmen Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cruz Alvarez (Plaintiff); Mercedes Ayala (Plaintiff); Maricela Figuera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Pacoima Plaza Shopping Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Answer (Answer of cross-defendant Juanita Del Carmen Morales to Pacoima Plaza Shopping Center, LLC's Cross Complaint); Filed by JUanita Del Carmen Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Cruz Alvarez (Plaintiff); Mercedes Ayala (Plaintiff); Maricela Figuera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Mercedes Ayala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC630806    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 2

Figuera et al v. Del Carmen Morales et al.

Two Motions by Defendant, Juanita Del Carmen Morales, to Compel Plaintiffs’ Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One; and Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.

Within 20 days, Plaintiffs, Cruz Alvarez; Hector Pena, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Mercedes Ayala; Mercedes Ayala; and Marciela Figuera, are ordered to provide verified responses without objection the Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production of Documents, Set One. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2030.290, § 2031.300.

Contrary to Defendant’s reply, Plaintiffs’ opposition was filed early on 11/15/19. It was due on 11/18/19, nine court days before the original hearing date of 12/2/19. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1005(b).

Defendant served the foregoing discovery on 7/3/19. Motions, Ex. A. Plaintiffs have not responded despite Defendant’s attempts to meet and confer with Plaintiffs’ counsel. Declaration of Colin M. Harrison, ¶¶ 4-7, Ex, B.

Defendant’s request for imposition of sanctions is DENIED. To obtain sanctions, the requesting party must identify the person, party and attorney against whom the sanction is sought as well as the type of sanction sought in the notice of motion. Cal Code Civ Proc § 2023.040.

The notices for each motion refer to monetary sanctions in the caption, but the notices request only terminating sanctions, not monetary sanctions. The points and authorities refer only to terminating sanctions.  Terminating sanctions are not warranted. Further, because insufficient notice was given, the Court declines to impose monetary sanctions.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC630806    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 2

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motions to Compel Discovery Responses set for hearing on 12/2/19 is continued to 1/8/20 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due date for the opposition and reply is based on the original hearing date.