Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2016 at 10:38:59 (UTC).

MARIBEL SOTO VS VICTOR MANUEL SOTO

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 MARIBEL SOTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VICTOR MANUEL SOTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GORDON, SCOTT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3871

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GORDON, SCOTT M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOTO MARIBEL

Respondent

SOTO VICTOR MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SHARP WENDY C.

SHARP WENDY CATHLEEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2012
  • Miscellaneous

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Notice-Case Review Re Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • Stipulation & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Notice (pet. atty, )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • OSC-Custody, Support, etc. Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less