Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 21:20:53 (UTC).

MARIAN AMAYA, ET-AL VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2012 MARIAN AMAYA, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, GAIL FEUER, BRIAN F. GASDIA, ROGER ITO, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and LORI ANN FOURNIER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2384

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

GAIL FEUER

BRIAN F. GASDIA

ROGER ITO

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LORI ANN FOURNIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Guardian Ad Litems and Others

KRAWIEC BELINDA

AMAYA MARIAN AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

KRAWIEC BELINDA AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

AMAYA GLORIA

AMAYA MARIAN

GALIPO DALE K. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

MAC DONALD PAT -DOE 1

MELGOZA JESSIE -DOE 2

BACA SHERIFF LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARDIROSSIAN & ASSOCIATES INC

GOLDSMITH ANTHONY E. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, ETC

4/18/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, ETC

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/24/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

12/23/2013: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE

1/2/2014: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE

Minute Order -

3/17/2014: Minute Order -

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

7/17/2014: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/17/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF L. TREVOR GRIMM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/21/2014: DECLARATION OF L. TREVOR GRIMM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND ETC.

9/16/2014: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND ETC.

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/16/2014: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ROWENA J. DIZON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ETC.

9/16/2014: DECLARATION OF ROWENA J. DIZON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ETC.

DEFENDANTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS? ?EVIDENCE? IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/25/2014: DEFENDANTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS? ?EVIDENCE? IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS? ADDITIONAL FACTS

9/25/2014: DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS? ADDITIONAL FACTS

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

9/25/2014: REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

AMENDED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

9/25/2014: AMENDED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE IRRELEVANT EVIDENCE RE CRIMINAL HISTORY AND DRUGS; ETC

9/26/2014: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE IRRELEVANT EVIDENCE RE CRIMINAL HISTORY AND DRUGS; ETC

Minute Order -

9/30/2014: Minute Order -

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2014)

9/30/2014: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2014)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketExParte Application/Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketRecpt/Depository of Ord to Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff); MARIAN, as successor-in-interest AMAYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff); MARIAN, as successor-in-interest AMAYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R; (Notice; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by GOLDSMITH, ANTHONY E., LAW OFFICES OF (Attorney); BELINDA KRAWIEC (Legacy Party); MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by BELINDA KRAWIEC (Legacy Party); MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff); MARIAN, as successor-in-interest AMAYA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by GOLDSMITH, ANTHONY E., LAW OFFICES OF (Attorney); BELINDA KRAWIEC (Legacy Party); MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff); MARIAN, as successor-in-interest AMAYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff); MARIAN, as successor-in-interest AMAYA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIAN, AMAYA (Plaintiff); MARIAN, as successor-in-interest AMAYA (Plaintiff); BELINDA, KRAWIEC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less