This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 03:29:09 (UTC).

MARIA SERRATO ET AL VS PI KAPPA PHI FRATERNITY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 MARIA SERRATO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PI KAPPA PHI FRATERNITY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM, RALPH C. HOFER and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6769

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

RALPH C. HOFER

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SERRATO JOSEPH

SERRATO MARIA

ARMANDO VILLA

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY THE

HARRISON DIANNE F.

LEWIS WESLEY AUGUST

PI KAPPA PHI FRATERNITY INC.

TERZIBACHIAN ALEX

WATKINS WILLIAM

ZETA MU CHAPTER OF PI KAPPA PHI FRATERNI-

MENDEZ MARCOS

MENDEZ MARCOS AN INDIVIDUAL

ZETA MU

GONZALEZ AGUSTIN AN INDIVIDUAL

GONZALEZ AGUSTIN

HA VINCENT

ROSAS ALAN

ANTHONY CHRISTOPHER

HERNANDEZ ANDREW JAMES AN INDIVIDUAL

MARTINEZ ERIC AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Respondent

ANTHONY CHRISTOPHER

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ABERLE DOUGLAS S. ESQ.

LEVITT LEICHENGER & ABERLE LLP

RUDMAN LAW FIRM PLC THE

ABERLE DOUGLAS S.

DERUBERTIS DAVID MICHAEL

DERUBERTIS DAVID MICHAEL ESQ.

DAVID A. DERUBERTIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ARCHER NORRIS

FOX DANA ALDEN ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

OSBORNE MICHAEL C.

SAFARIAN FIRM APC

INGLIS LEDBETTER & GOWER

GOWER RICHARD SCOTT

YOKA & SMITH LLP

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

OSBORNE MICHAEL CLAUDE

GOWER RICHARD S. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

COKINOS/YOUNG

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

7/1/2015: Summons

Complaint

7/1/2015: Complaint

Summons

7/1/2015: Summons

Minute Order

7/7/2015: Minute Order

Legacy Document

7/29/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/21/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/21/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

8/21/2015: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/21/2015: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/21/2015: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Related Case

9/1/2015: Notice of Related Case

Legacy Document

9/22/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/22/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/22/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/22/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/22/2015: Legacy Document

604 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA SERRATO (Plaintiff); JOSEPH SERRATO (Plaintiff); ARMANDO VILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Michael C. Osborne (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Continued Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by ARMANDO VILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Hearing on Motion - Other - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review (Court Order Continuing Case Set on A Dark Date;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Continuing Case Set on...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Court Order Continuing Case Set on...) of 02/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Hearing on Motion - Other - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
1,123 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-07-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (BC586770)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by MARIA SERRATO (Plaintiff); JOSEPH SERRATO (Plaintiff); ARMANDO VILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • Summons (BC586770)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PI KAPPA PHI FRATERNITY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY is a litigant