This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:05:32 (UTC).

MARIA SALVATI ET AL VS RATCHANIDA POUPEE KOMENKUL ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 MARIA SALVATI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RATCHANIDA POUPEE KOMENKUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1903

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SALVATI CARL

SALVATI MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

KOMENKUL RATCHANIDA POUPEE

RODEO REALTY INC.

KOMENKUL RATCHANIDA "POUPEE"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FORD & DIULIO PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CARLSON ROBERT J. ESQ.

ROSTOW & AUSTER LLP

CARLSON ROBERT J. LAW OFFICES OF

GHARAKHANI I.REZA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FINANCIAL ABUSE; ETC

11/24/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FINANCIAL ABUSE; ETC

SUMMONS

11/24/2015: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF MORGAN M. HALFORD, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT [CODE CIV. PROC. ?430.41(3)(A)]

1/19/2016: DECLARATION OF MORGAN M. HALFORD, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT [CODE CIV. PROC. ?430.41(3)(A)]

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT RODEO REALTY, INC., TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MORGAN M. HAORD, ESQ.

1/19/2016: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT RODEO REALTY, INC., TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF MORGAN M. HAORD, ESQ.

DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA ?POUPEE? KOMENKUL?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SALVATI?S COMPLAINT

2/9/2016: DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA ?POUPEE? KOMENKUL?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SALVATI?S COMPLAINT

COMPENDIUM OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA ?POUPEE? KOMENKUL?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SALVATI?S COMPLAINT

2/9/2016: COMPENDIUM OF FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA ?POUPEE? KOMENKUL?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SALVATI?S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF REZA I. GHARAKHANI, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA ?POUPEE? KOMENKUL?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SALVATI?S COMPLAINT

2/9/2016: DECLARATION OF REZA I. GHARAKHANI, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA ?POUPEE? KOMENKUL?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SALVATI?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF RODEO REALTY, INC.

2/24/2016: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF RODEO REALTY, INC.

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/25/2016: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

3/3/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Minute Order

3/3/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF REZA I. GUARAXHANI, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA "POUPEE" KOMENKUL'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SAL VATI'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT RATCHAN1DA "POUPEE" KOMENKU

8/5/2016: DECLARATION OF REZA I. GUARAXHANI, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RATCHANIDA "POUPEE" KOMENKUL'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MARIA SAL VATI'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT RATCHAN1DA "POUPEE" KOMENKU

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Salvati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Maria Salvati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • at 11:30 AM in Department B; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • Declaration of Diligence; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Salvati (Plaintiff); Carl Salvati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FINANCIAL ABUSE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.