This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:25:41 (UTC).

MARIA PARLADE VS SANTA MONICA MOTOR GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 MARIA PARLADE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANTA MONICA MOTOR GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2732

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARLADE MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 75

FCA US LLC

SANTA MONICA MOTOR GROUP

SANTA MONICA CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

RAM SANTA MONICA CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GLASSEY SHARON E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BRONSTEIN PETER C. ESQ.

KUENSTER JENNIFER A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 1780(D)

6/6/2016: PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 1780(D)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/13/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DEFENDANT FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/1/2016: DEFENDANT FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

10/28/2016: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SANTA MONICA MOTOR GROUP DBA SANTA MONICA CHRSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

9/21/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SANTA MONICA MOTOR GROUP DBA SANTA MONICA CHRSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

6/16/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

DECLARATION OF SHARON E. GLASSEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6

1/9/2017: DECLARATION OF SHARON E. GLASSEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6

PROOF OF SERVICE

10/31/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/27/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/20/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

DECLARATION OF MARIA PARALADA IN SUPPORT OF PALINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6

1/9/2017: DECLARATION OF MARIA PARALADA IN SUPPORT OF PALINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6

CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES:

1/9/2017: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES:

Minute Order

11/14/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

1/9/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

7/5/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

6/7/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/20/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Maria Parlade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Parlade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Maria Parlade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Parlade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DEFENDANT FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE CONSUMERS LEGAL REMEDIES ACT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES AS TO SANTA MONICA MOTOR GROUP; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 1780(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Parlade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less