This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 14:08:04 (UTC).

MARIA LUZ AVILA ET AL VS BORIS A PERAZA ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2016 MARIA LUZ AVILA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BORIS A PERAZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5872

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AVILA MARIA LUZ

Defendants and Respondents

NORTH HILLS RECYCLING INC.

DOES 1 TO 30

PERAZA BORIS A.

Minors

AVILA JORGE OMAR

AVILA NATALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

DUFOUR MICHAEL R.

SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP

Defendant Attorney

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/13/2018: Minute Order

ORDER CONTINUING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

3/13/2018: ORDER CONTINUING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES

NOTICE OF RULING

3/20/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Unknown

3/26/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

10/29/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/5/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

7/6/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

7/6/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

SUMMONS

7/12/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/9/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/9/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/2/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Unknown

6/8/2017: Unknown

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

12/12/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Luz Avila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; (Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE; DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Luz Avila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC625872    Hearing Date: January 24, 2020    Dept: 29

Avila et al. v. Peraza, et al.

The Court has considered the two Expedited Petitions to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claims of Minors (Jorge Omar Avila, Age 14 and Natalia Avila, Age 10) and the Declaration of L. Dean Smith, filed on 1/10/20. The Court finds that the settlements for each claimant is reasonable and approves both petitions. No appearance is necessary.

The Court approves the following distributions.

Jorge Omar Avila

Attorney’s fees (25%)

500.00

Medical expenses

323.00

Costs

275.00

Total fees and costs

$1,098.00

Total Settlement

$2,000.00

Less credits

-1,098.00

Net Settlement

$ 902.00

Natalia Avila

Attorney’s fees (25%)

687.50

Medical expenses

64.12

Costs

275.00

Total fees and costs

$1,026.62

Total Settlement

$2,750.00

Less credits

-1,026.62

Net Settlement blocked account

$1,723.38

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE COMPLIANCE (Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account) and OSC RE DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION are set for 5/22/2020 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance is required if the depository’s acknowledgement of receipt of the order and the funds and Request for Dismissal of the entire action are filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.