This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 07:23:03 (UTC).

MARIA LOPEZ-TRUJILLO ET AL VS RENAE MARTICORENA

Case Summary

On 12/12/2014 MARIA LOPEZ-TRUJILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RENAE MARTICORENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6686

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOPEZ ASAEL

LOPEZ-TRUJILLO MARIA

ORTIZ JUVENAL

ORTIZ PRISCILLA

ORTIZ-LOPEZ PRISCILLA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

MARTICORENA RENAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BOB B. KHAKSHOOY

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINTS FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/12/2014: PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINTS FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS

12/12/2014: SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/27/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/28/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/6/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

9/9/2016: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order

9/26/2016: Minute Order

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/5/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/2/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Minute Order

9/14/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC566686    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA LOPEZ-TRUJILLO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

RENAE MARTICORENA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC566686

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING PETITIONS TO APPROVE COMPROMISES OF MINORS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 3, 2019

Plaintiffs, Maria Lopez-Trujillo, Priscilla Ortiz-Lopez, Juvenal Ortiz, Priscilla Ortiz, and Asael Lopez filed this action against Defendant, Rene Marticorena for damages arising out of an automobile accident. 

At this time, Priscilla Ortiz-Lopez seeks approval of a compromise between Ezequiel Ortiz Lopez, age 8, and Defendant.  Additionally, Maria Lopez-Trujillo seeks approval of compromises between Juvenal Ortiz, age 16 and Asael Ortiz, age 17, and Defendant. 

The Court previously denied the petitions on a number of grounds.  Notably, the five-year dismissal statute in the case is set to run on 12/12/19, making time of the essence in connection with these petitions. 

The Court previously expressed concern that Ezequiel is not a named plaintiff in the action.  The Court cannot find any record of Ezequiel being named in the action.  The Court wishes to address this with Counsel at the time of the hearing.  The Court is concerned about approving a compromise in favor of a non-party to the lawsuit. 

The other two petitions continue to have minor irregularities, but the Court is inclined to go forward in ruling on the petitions despite the defects.  By way of example, at ¶18, Petitioners indicate there are no other fees being paid, which is clearly incorrect, as fees are being paid in connection with each of the three petitions, and likely in connection with the adult plaintiffs’ settlements also.

Pursuant to CRC 7.952, Petitioners and Claimants must appear and testify unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  Ezequiel is eight years old, and the Court will excuse his appearance.  Juvenal and Asael are sixteen and seventeen, and the Court will require them to appear and testify before approving the settlement.  Both Petitioners must also appear and testify.  The Court specifically wishes to hear testimony concerning what amount of the adult plaintiffs’ settlements is being paid as attorneys’ fees.  The Court will likely reduce the minor claimants’ attorneys’ fees from 30% to 25% after hearing argument. 

Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice.