This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 12:22:27 (UTC).

MARIA GONZALES VS THE HERRERA SINDELL GROUP INC., ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2013 MARIA GONZALES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE HERRERA SINDELL GROUP INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, ROGER ITO and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3323

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

ROGER ITO

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALES MARC

GONZALES MARIA

Defendants

CO

HERRERA JUAN

HERRERA MICHAEL H.

THE HERRERA SINDELL GROUP INC.

HERRERA JUAN AN INDIVIDUAL

THE HERRERA SINDELL GROUP INC. A

GOLDEN STATE CAPITAL GROUP INC.

GILBERT A. HERRERA AN INDIVIDUAL

RICHARD IRA SINDELL

CO-OP MANAGEMENT

GOLDEN STATE CAPITAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA

HERRERA GILBERT H.

RICHARD IRA SINDELL AN INDIVIDUAL

SINDELL RICHARD IRA

RICHARD IRA SINDELL AN

GILBERT A. HERRERA AN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDERS STEPHEN M. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

EVAN MICHAEL HESS ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Not held-No appearances) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALC/F 10/23/14) - Not held-No appearances

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALPER M/O 09/18/14) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE SERVICE/ANSWER/RESPONSE TO THESECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT/TRIALSETTING CONFERENCEPER M/O 05/07/14) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF LIS PENDENS ); Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (LIS PENDENS ); Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketDeclaration (OF EX PARTE NOTICE ); Filed by Petitioner & Petitioner in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by MARIA GONZALES (Plaintiff); MARC GONZALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA GONZALES (Plaintiff); MARC GONZALES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CO-OP MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE CAPITAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HERRERA SINDELL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where C.O. is a litigant