This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:33:57 (UTC).

MARIA GARCIA VS UNIVERSITY PARK HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 MARIA GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against UNIVERSITY PARK HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4181

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GARCIA MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

UNIVERSITY OF PARK HOSPITAL

DOES 1-100

UNIVERSITY OF PARK HOSPITAL INCORRECT

UNIVERSITY PARK HEALTHCARE CENTER

UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM H. NEWKIRK

Defendant Attorney

REID BRYAN R.

Other Attorneys

NEWKIRK WILLIAM H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/2/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF MARGARET SPENCER, R.N. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/2/2018: DECLARATION OF MARGARET SPENCER, R.N. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/2/2018: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM R. MOFFITT

4/5/2018: DEFENDANT UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM R. MOFFITT

ORDER

4/5/2018: ORDER

Other -

8/29/2018: Other -

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM H. NEWKIRK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/30/2018: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM H. NEWKIRK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT UNITED CONVALESCENT FACJLJTIES, INC S REPLY TO. PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/5/2018: DEFENDANT UNITED CONVALESCENT FACJLJTIES, INC S REPLY TO. PLAINTIFF S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;MOTION DENIED

9/12/2018: ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;MOTION DENIED

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.10 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING ALLEGED VIOLATIONS OF INTERNAL POLICIES AND PROCEDURES

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.10 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING ALLEGED VIOLATIONS OF INTERNAL POLICIES AND PROCEDURES

DEFENDANT UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING ANY EXPERT OPINION REGARDING A VIOLATION OF STATUTE OR REGULATION

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING ANY EXPERT OPINION REGARDING A VIOLATION OF STATUTE OR REGULATION

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7 TO PRECLUDE USE OF TEXTBOOKS AND TREATISES, THEIR CONTENTS OR RELEVANCE, THEIR TITLES OR AUTHORS, ON DIRECT EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7 TO PRECLUDE USE OF TEXTBOOKS AND TREATISES, THEIR CONTENTS OR RELEVANCE, THEIR TITLES OR AUTHORS, ON DIRECT EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM ATTEMPTING TO INTRODUCE ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM ATTEMPTING TO INTRODUCE ANY EVIDENCE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM ATTEMPTING TO USE STATUTES AND REGULATIONS TO ESTABLISH THE STANDARD OF CARE OR A BREACH THEREOF

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM ATTEMPTING TO USE STATUTES AND REGULATIONS TO ESTABLISH THE STANDARD OF CARE OR A BREACH THEREOF

Motion in Limine

10/4/2018: Motion in Limine

Notice of Settlement

10/12/2018: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

4/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES (MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE)

12/16/2016: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES (MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; (Motion for Leave) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Notice (of Taking Defendant's Motion for Leave to Submi8t Late Expert Witness Designation Off Calendar); Filed by University of Park Hospital (Incorrect (Defendant); UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Notice of settlement of entire case; Filed by Maria Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Motion in Limine no.2 Excluding Hearsay Statements from Defendant University Park Healthcare Center's Records Related to The incident; Memorandum of Pointes and Authorities; Declaration of Mariam Danielyan; Filed by Maria Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Motion in Limine no.1 excluding Testimony from Margaret Spencer, RN, or, any other Defense Expert not Properly Designated, Regarding the Issue of Standard of Care and Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Mariam Dan; Filed by Maria Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Motion for Leave; Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DECLARATION OF WILLIAM R. MOFFITT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Answer; Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES (MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC. DBA UNIVERSITY PARK HEALTHCARE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWKIRK WILLIAM