This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 04:00:27 (UTC).

MARIA FARRELL VS. NEW MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 MARIA FARRELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4023

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARRELL MARIA

Defendants

CRUZ CHRISTIAN

DOMAN STEVEN J.

LEGAL SOLUTIONS CENTER

MARTINEZ ELIZABETH

NEW MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC.

VERDUGO CONSTRUCTION INC.

VERDUGO FRANCISCO

VERDUGO FRANKIE

VERDUGO LIZ

NEW HOME SOLUTIONS

NEW MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS

VERDUGO FRANK

VERDUGO ELIZABETH

STEVEN J. DOMAN DBA NEW MORTGAGE SOLUTION

SULGATI GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.

DOMAN STEVEN J. DBA CD MORTGAGE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOLLIN KURT S. LAW OFFICE

Defendant Attorneys

LARRY E. WASSERMAN

WASSERMAN LARRY E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Default Prove Up Hearing (Default Prove Up Hearing; Plf to prepare proposed judgment) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Default Prove Up Hearing (Default Prove Up Hearing; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Default Prove Up Hearing (Default Prove Up Hearing; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Not held-No appearances) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by Christian Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Maria Farrell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.