This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2017 at 22:03:07 (UTC).

MARIA ELPIDIO ET AL VS JOSE VILLALOBOS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 MARIA ELPIDIO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JOSE VILLALOBOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB and JOANNE O'DONNELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0590

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

JOANNE O'DONNELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ELPIDIO MARIA

MARTINEZ PATRICIA

MEDINA MARIA

NAJERA-VILLAR MADAI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

LA FOGATA

VILLALOBOS JOSE

Other

STONE LAWRENCE H. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RAMIREZ MIGUEL S. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

STONE LAWRENCE H. ESQ.

BRUCE T. MCINTOSH ESQ

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/9/2015: Unknown

JOINT STATUS REPORT

9/18/2015: JOINT STATUS REPORT

DEFENDANT JOSE VILLALOBOS'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF ELEAZAR GARCIA; DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE H. STONE

5/16/2016: DEFENDANT JOSE VILLALOBOS'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF ELEAZAR GARCIA; DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE H. STONE

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING JACKSON LEWIS P.C.'S MOTION BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

5/16/2016: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING JACKSON LEWIS P.C.'S MOTION BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ATTENDANCE OF ELEAZAR GARCIA AT DEPOSITION AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOSE VILLALOBOS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,125.00;

5/18/2016: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ATTENDANCE OF ELEAZAR GARCIA AT DEPOSITION AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOSE VILLALOBOS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,125.00;

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION

6/7/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION

DECLARATION OF BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

6/13/2016: DECLARATION OF BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

Minute Order

7/26/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. 2 AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOSE

9/16/2016: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. 2 AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOSE

PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LIST

11/7/2016: PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/27/2017: DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DECLARATION OF BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/27/2017: DECLARATION OF BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/24/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

DECLARATION OF BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION

5/10/2017: DECLARATION OF BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

5/16/2017: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Minute Order

5/16/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER OF MAY 10, 2017

5/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER OF MAY 10, 2017

JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER BENCH TRIAL

6/12/2017: JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER BENCH TRIAL

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Declaration (BRUCE T. MCINTOSH, ETC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Points and Authorities Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO PERMIT PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO BE HEARD PRIOR TO COMMENCEMENT OF TRIAL; DECLARATION OF MIGUEL RAMIR) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Motion to Compel (FURTHER RESPONSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Statement of Facts (SEPARATE, ETC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • Proof of Service (re defendant's mtn to be relieved as counsel ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Report-Joint Status-VELS Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Stipulation and Order (STIP REQUESTING ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Order (TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO MARIA MEDINA ONLY; dismisses all her claims against all defendants; ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC560590    Hearing Date: January 03, 2020    Dept: 47

Maria Elpidio, et al. v. Jose Villalobos

 

MOTION TO APPOINT A RECEIVER TO SELL JUDGMENT DEBTOR’S INTEREST IN A LIQUOR LICENSE

 

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Maria Elpidio, Patricia Martinez, and Madai Najera-Villar

RESPONDING PARTY(S): No opposition on eCourt as of January 2, 2020.

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

This was a wage and hour action (non-class action).

On June 12, 2017, the Court entered judgment in favor of Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs now move to appoint a receiver to sell judgment debtor Jose Villalobos’s interest in a liquor license.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiffs Maria Elpidio, Patricia Martinez, and Madai Najera-Villar’s motion to appoint a receiver to sell judgment debtor’s interest in a liquor license is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

Post-judgment motions to appoint a receiver are heard by Department 44 of this Court. (Local Rule 2.7(b) [“check the court’s website”]; http://www.lacourt.org/division/civil/pdf/AssignmentofMatterstoMOSK.pdf.)

If desired, Moving party is directed to reserve a new hearing date with that department.

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: January 3, 2020 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org