This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 22:32:44 (UTC).

MARIA DEL ROCIO CRUZ, ET AL. VS. HENKEL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2010 MARIA DEL ROCIO CRUZ, filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against HENKEL CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4239

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL ROCIO CRUZ MARIA

Defendants

THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC INC.

HENKEL CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

CRAY VALLEY USA LLC

DIC AMERICAS INC.

SUMITOMO CHEMICAL AMERICA INC.

SPECTRUM LABORATORY PRODUCTS INC.

DIC CORPORATION

CHEMICA

CLARIANT CORPORATION

SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO. LTD.

3M COMPANY

UCT INC.

BASF CORPORATION

HEXION SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC. AS

NATIONAL STARCH AND CHEMICAL COMPANY

AKZO NOBEL POLYMER CHEMICALS LLC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSE KLEIN & MARIAS LAW OFFICES OF .

Defendant Attorneys

DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

SCHOLER KAYE LAW OFFICES OF

CROWELL & MORING LLP

FITZPATRICK & HUNT TUCKER COLLIER

FULBRIGHT & JAWORSKI L.L.P.

GORDON & REES LAW OFFICES OF

GORDON & REES LLP

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

NEULFELD MARKS GRALNEK & MAKER

O'MELVENY & MYERS LAW OFFICES OF

PAUL HASTINGS LLP

REED SMITH LLP

ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD LAW OFFC

SHOOK HARDY & BACON L.L.P.

SKINNER DEFOREST KOSCELNIK YOKITIS

STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/10/2014

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2014

DocketProceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause William Barry 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2014

DocketProceeding/Event Result:Order to Show Cause Matter continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2014

DocketMinute order entered: 2014-06-03 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2014

DocketDocument:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2014

DocketDocument:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2014

DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 1487 Days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2014

DocketDocument:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2014

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2014

DocketDocument:Partial Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
497 More Docket Entries
06/04/2010

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2010

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2010

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2010

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2010

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2010

DocketDocument:Ord-Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2010

DocketDocument:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2010

DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2010

DocketDocument:Complaint Fld - No Summons Issued Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2010

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Toxic Tort/Environmental

[+] Read More [-] Read Less