This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2016 at 06:04:03 (UTC).

MARIA DEL CONSUELO MONTES ET AL VS EISNER PEDIATRIC AND FAMI

Case Summary

On 09/11/2014 MARIA DEL CONSUELO MONTES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EISNER PEDIATRIC AND FAMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROLF M. TREU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7392

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROLF M. TREU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CANO RAUL MONTES

MONTES MARIA DEL CONSUELO

Defendants and Respondents

DEOS 1 THROUGH 100

EISNER PEDIATRIC AND FAMILY MEDICAL CENT-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PHILIP P. DELUCA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SARRIS NICHOLAS W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/11/2014: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/17/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/10/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT EISNER PEDIATRIC AND FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

10/27/2014: DEFENDANT EISNER PEDIATRIC AND FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Unknown

11/25/2014: Unknown

Unknown

11/25/2014: Unknown

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

11/25/2014: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

12/1/2014: Unknown

Unknown

12/2/2014: Unknown

Minute Order

12/11/2014: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF ERIC M. GRUZEN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER AND WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST DEFENDANT

12/30/2014: DECLARATION OF ERIC M. GRUZEN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER AND WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST DEFENDANT

Unknown

1/7/2015: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

1/14/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

1/14/2015: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/13/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/1/2015: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/22/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJ. (ENTIRE ACTION) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Order-Case Management Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EISNER PEDIATRIC & FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARRIS NICHOLAS WAYNE