Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:59:22 (UTC).

MARIA DEL CARMEN FIGUEROA VS CITIBANK NA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/17/2012 MARIA DEL CARMEN FIGUEROA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITIBANK NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, AMY D. HOGUE, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, ELIA WEINBACH, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0571

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

AMY D. HOGUE

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ELIA WEINBACH

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIGUEROA MARIA DEL CARMEN

Claimant

JOINT POWERS INSURANCE AUTHORITY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITIBANK

CITIBANK INC.

CITIBANK NA

SO HYE

CITIBANK NA (ERRONEOUSLY SUED)

CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

SUED CITIBANK NA ERRONEOUSLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONAHUE TIMOTHY LAW OFFICES OF

Claimant Attorney

SMITH S. HENSLEE LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

BRADLEY & GMELICH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

5/14/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICF. OF MOTH)N ANI) MOTION 10 COMPII. FUR1IWR RFSPOSKS TO SPECIAL.. INTERROGATOHI ES; POINTS ANI) AUTHORITIES; IWC[.A RATION OF TI MOTIIV .1. DONAHUE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BRADLEY & CMFLIC

5/28/2013: NOTICF. OF MOTH)N ANI) MOTION 10 COMPII. FUR1IWR RFSPOSKS TO SPECIAL.. INTERROGATOHI ES; POINTS ANI) AUTHORITIES; IWC[.A RATION OF TI MOTIIV .1. DONAHUE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST BRADLEY & CMFLIC

SFPARAF: STATFMKNT IN SUPPORT OF 1OTION TO CONIPFI. FURTII KR RESPONSES TO SPKCI,I. I NI?ERROGA?RORP ES

5/28/2013: SFPARAF: STATFMKNT IN SUPPORT OF 1OTION TO CONIPFI. FURTII KR RESPONSES TO SPKCI,I. I NI?ERROGA?RORP ES

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AND HY SO?S CROSS-COMPALINT

7/5/2013: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AS TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT AND HY SO?S CROSS-COMPALINT

PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE

9/5/2013: PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE

DEFENDANT, C1TIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE

9/13/2013: DEFENDANT, C1TIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE

DEFENDANT CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JONATHAN A. ROSS, ESQ AND VERONICA DE LA TORRE; EXHIBIT

9/13/2013: DEFENDANT CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF JONATHAN A. ROSS, ESQ AND VERONICA DE LA TORRE; EXHIBIT

Minute Order -

9/20/2013: Minute Order -

CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS FROM EVIDENCE AND ALL REFERENCE TO ANY DOCUMENT NOT PREVIOUSLY OR TIMELY PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY; ETC

9/26/2013: CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL DOCUMENTS FROM EVIDENCE AND ALL REFERENCE TO ANY DOCUMENT NOT PREVIOUSLY OR TIMELY PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY; ETC

WITNESS LIST

9/27/2013: WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE

9/27/2013: DEFENDANT CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE

MOTION IN LIMINE AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE AND/OR INTRODUCTION OF THE POLICE REPORT MIL= B

10/11/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE AND ORDER TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE AND/OR INTRODUCTION OF THE POLICE REPORT MIL= B

Minute Order -

10/16/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION OF CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. ROSS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/8/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION OF CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. ROSS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S REPLY TO HYE SO?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF MIRTH WHITE IN SUPPOR

12/31/2013: DEFENDANT, CROSS-COMPLAINANT, AND CROSS-DEFENDANT CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.?S REPLY TO HYE SO?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; DECLARATION OF MIRTH WHITE IN SUPPOR

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/31/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DEPARTMENT FOR MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT HEARING

1/3/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DEPARTMENT FOR MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT HEARING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/18/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA93, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal (PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT) - Hrg previously advncd. and vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA del CARMEN FIGUEROA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal W/out Prejudice; Filed by CITIBANK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal W/out Prejudice (X-COMPLAINT FILED BY HYE SO ON 8/7/12 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department LA93, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Final Status Conference (C/F 01/17/14) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
239 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO HYE SO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by MARIA del CARMEN FIGUEROA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department F, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Matter held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY DONAHUE REGARDING SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIFINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant