This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:07:15 (UTC).

MARIA DE JESUS SEPULVEDA VS UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 MARIA DE JESUS SEPULVEDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9373

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SEPULVEDA MARIA DE JESUS

Defendants and Respondents

UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EMRANI JACOB ESQ.

DROUET BRETT CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LONG MICHAEL FRANCIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Complaint

11/10/2016: Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/3/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Reply

2/14/2019: Reply

Motion to Compel

1/14/2019: Motion to Compel

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE AUTHORIZATION FOR NEUROPSYCHOLOGY PSYCHIATRY RECORDS PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT IN APRIL 201N NOT COMPLIED WITH AND TO CONTINUE TR

7/19/2018: DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE AUTHORIZATION FOR NEUROPSYCHOLOGY PSYCHIATRY RECORDS PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT IN APRIL 201N NOT COMPLIED WITH AND TO CONTINUE TR

Stipulation

1/16/2019: Stipulation

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/3/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order

1/16/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/3/2017: Unknown

Summons

11/10/2016: Summons

Minute Order

2/22/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

2/7/2019: Opposition

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

5/3/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF RULING

7/31/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

CoverSheet

11/10/2016: CoverSheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Medical Records from Anil Sharma, MD and Request for Monetary Sanctions From Anil Sharma, M.D.) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Medical Records ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Order to Compel Plaintiff's Medical Records from Anil Sharma, M.D.); Filed by Uka's Big Saver Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL RECORDS FROM ANIL SHARMA); Filed by Maria De Jesus Sepulveda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Uka's Big Saver Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (to Ex Parte); Filed by Maria De Jesus Sepulveda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Uka's Big Saver Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Uka's Big Saver Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria De Jesus Sepulveda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria De Jesus Sepulveda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Maria De Jesus Sepulveda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less