This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 16:46:01 (UTC).

MARGARET IMHOFF VS SUZANNE GOIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2015 MARGARET IMHOFF filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against SUZANNE GOIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3161

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

IMHOFF MARGARET

RESNICK NAYA

Respondents and Defendants

DIRTY CHICKEN INC.

DOTOLO VINNY

GOIN SUZANNE

LENTZ DAVID

LUCQUES CATERING INC.

O&A HOSPITALITY LLC

SHOOK JON

STEIN CAROLYN

CITRIN JOSIAH

RUSTIC CANYON FOOD AND WINE INC.

LOEB JOSH

NATHAN ZOE

1104 WILSHIRE LLC

MELISSA MATALLANA

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

Not Classified By Court

JANNEY & JANNEY

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JABAGCHOURIAN ARA RAY ESQ

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

RUDIN AARON PAUL

BRINK R SCOTT

CAMHI HOWARD IVAN

GUPTA MOLSHREE

LEFF RANDALL STEVEN

LUDWIG JORDAN LEE

MEYER KRYSTLE DAWN

POLISHUK ALEXANDER

SELMONT RUSSELL MATTHEW

TALCOTT LIGHTFOOT VANDERVELDE & SADOWSK

NAM CANDICE SOYEON

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Judgment

4/19/2023: Judgment

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: HEARING OF FEBRUARY 3, 2023

2/14/2023: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: HEARING OF FEBRUARY 3, 2023

Order - ORDER ENTERING COSTS

11/18/2022: Order - ORDER ENTERING COSTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED ORDER)

11/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED ORDER)

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B318955)

11/1/2022: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B318955)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/28/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

10/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B318955

8/29/2022: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B318955

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S BANKRUPTCY)

8/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF'S BANKRUPTCY)

Brief - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF REGARDING BANKRUPTCY CODE SECTIONS 362 AND 523

8/12/2022: Brief - PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF REGARDING BANKRUPTCY CODE SECTIONS 362 AND 523

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' JOINT BRIEF REGARDING BANKRUPTCY CODE SECTIONS 362 AND 523

8/12/2022: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' JOINT BRIEF REGARDING BANKRUPTCY CODE SECTIONS 362 AND 523

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/3/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - ORDER ENTERING COSTS ON APPEAL

7/21/2022: Order - ORDER ENTERING COSTS ON APPEAL

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/12/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/12/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/12/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/18/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/19/2023

DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: 1104 Wilshire, LLc (Defendant); Josiah Citrin (Defendant); O&A Hospitality, LLC (Defendant); As to: Margaret Imhoff (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketMessage Board Posting Re: Hearing of February 3, 2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketUpdated -- Message Board Posting Re: Hearing of February 3, 2023: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

DocketUpdated -- Order Entering Costs: Status Date changed from 11/18/2022 to 11/18/2022 ; Filed By: Vinny Dotolo (Defendant),Lucques Catering, Inc. (Defendant),Suzanne Goin (Defendant),Josh Loeb (Defendant),Dirty Chicken, Inc. (Defendant),Rustic Canyon Food and Wine, Inc. (Defendant),Josiah Citrin (Defendant),1104 Wilshire, LLc (Defendant),Zoe Nathan (Defendant),David Lentz (Defendant),O&A Hospitality, LLC (Defendant),Jon Shook (Defendant),Carolyn Stein (Defendant); Result: Entered ; Name Extension changed from (Proposed) Order Entering Costs to Entering Costs ; Exact Name: blank ; Result Date: 11/18/2022 ; As To Parties changed from Margaret Imhoff (Plaintiff) to Margaret Imhoff (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

Docket(Proposed) Order Entering Costs; Signed and Filed by: 1104 Wilshire, LLc (Defendant); Josiah Citrin (Defendant); Dirty Chicken, Inc. (Defendant); Vinny Dotolo (Defendant); Suzanne Goin (Defendant); David Lentz (Defendant); Josh Loeb (Defendant); Lucques Catering, Inc. (Defendant); Zoe Nathan (Defendant); O&A Hospitality, LLC (Defendant); Rustic Canyon Food and Wine, Inc. (Defendant); Jon Shook (Defendant); Carolyn Stein (Defendant); As to: Margaret Imhoff (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Submission of Proposed Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Submission of Proposed Order scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 11/15/2022; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B318955): As To Parties: removed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2022

DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B318955); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2022

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Submission of Proposed Order scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
490 More Docket Entries
10/23/2015

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2015

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2015

DocketDocument:Order Filed by: Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2015

DocketProceeding/Event:Order-Complex Determination Amy D. Hogue 1:30 pm

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2015

DocketCalendaring:Initial Status Conference 01/14/16 at 2:30 pm Amy D. Hogue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2015

DocketSpecial Status Start:Case Determined to be Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2015

DocketMinute order entered: 2015-10-15 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2015

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2015

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Antitrust/Trade Regulation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2015

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less