This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 00:02:35 (UTC).

MARCOS ALAMILLO VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2016 MARCOS ALAMILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2440

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALAMILLO MARCOS

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 10

UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BECKER LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/2/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

3/2/2016: SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/16/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/5/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Marcos Alamillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PACIFIC SERVICES INC is a litigant