This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2017 at 06:22:29 (UTC).

MARCO MARTINEZ VS TWIN MED LLC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 MARCO MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TWIN MED LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8529

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ MARCO

Defendants and Respondents

TWIN MED LLC

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SROURIAN LAW FIRM

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DE CASTRO JOSE-MANUEL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/25/2016: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF

10/25/2016: PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/10/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/15/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT TWIN MED, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/21/2016: DEFENDANT TWIN MED, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Unknown

12/29/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

1/13/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Proof of Service (summons and complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWIN MED LLC is a litigant