This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:00:35 (UTC).

MARCELLO PALMIERI VS ALAN TRAYNOR ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 MARCELLO PALMIERI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALAN TRAYNOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1142

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALMIERI MARCELLO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

TRAYNOR ALAN

CRACK OF DAWN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WEINSTEIN ZEV Y.

MANOUCHERHRI SAHM ESQ.

SCHWIMER WEINSTEIN LLP

SADEGHIBAHARI SOHEIL

Defendant Attorney

RAFFALOW BRETOI & ADAMS

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/8/2017: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MARCELLO PALMIERI, AN INDIVIDUAL

2/27/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MARCELLO PALMIERI, AN INDIVIDUAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/27/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN OUR FIRM

4/6/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN OUR FIRM

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/8/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

5/1/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

Substitution of Attorney

8/8/2018: Substitution of Attorney

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL DISCOVERY CUTOFF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR SAID MOTION; DECLARATION OF SOHEIL BAHARI, ES

9/6/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL DISCOVERY CUTOFF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR SAID MOTION; DECLARATION OF SOHEIL BAHARI, ES

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/20/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Opposition

12/21/2018: Opposition

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/22/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/2/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/2/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Compel

5/7/2019: Motion to Compel

Opposition

5/20/2019: Opposition

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/21/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/21/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Alan Traynor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Independent Medi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Alan Traynor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ADDITIONAL PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Motion to Compel ([Defendant's] Plaintiff Marcello Palmieri to Submit to an Additional Independent Medical Examination with Dr. Steven Nagelberg); Filed by Alan Traynor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MARCELLO PALMIERI, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Alan Traynor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Marcello Palmieri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641142    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

MARCELLO PALMIERI, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

ALAN TRAYNOR, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC641142

Hearing Date: November 8, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

DEFENDANT’S motions FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Plaintiff Marcello Palmieri (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Alan Traynor (“Defendant”) following a motor vehicle collision. Now, Defendant moves for terminating sanctions based upon Plaintiff’s failure to appear for a Court-ordered medical examination by an orthopedic surgeon.

Where a party willfully disobeys a discovery order, courts have discretion to impose terminating, issue, evidence or monetary sanctions. (Code Civ. Proc. §§ 2023.010(g), 2030.290(c); R.S. Creative, Inc. v. Creative Cotton, Ltd. (1999) 75 Cal.App.4th 486, 495.) Ultimate discovery sanctions are justified where there is a willful discovery order violation, a history of abuse, and evidence showing that less severe sanctions would not produce compliance with discovery rules. (Van Sickle v. Gilbert (2011) 196 Cal.App.4th 1495, 1516.) “[A] penalty as severe as dismissal or default is not authorized where noncompliance with discovery is caused by an inability to comply rather than willfulness or bad faith.” (Brown v. Sup. Ct. (1986) 180 Cal.App.3d 701, 707.)

On June 3, 2019, the Court granted Defendant’s motion to compel an independent medical examination by a designated orthopedic surgeon. The Court ordered Plaintiff to submit to the examination within 45 days of notice, which occurred on June 4, 2019 by mail, meaning that the examination should have been completed on or before July 24, 2019. However, Plaintiff’s former counsel filed a motion to be relieved on May 21, 2019, which ultimately was granted on June 24, 2019, following two hearings on the motion. Defendant filed the instant motion on October 9, 2019, and Plaintiff filed a substitution of counsel form on October 25, 2019. Based upon this record, the Court cannot conclude that Plaintiff’s failure to comply with this Court’s order warrants a terminating sanction. “[T]erminating sanctions should only be ordered when there has been previous noncompliance with a rule or order and it appears a less severe sanction would not be effective.” (Link v. Cater, 60 Cal.App.4th 1315, 1326 [emphasis added].) The Court believes that a further order will effectuate the medical examination. Defendant did not move for any other sanctions, so the Court orders none.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for terminating sanctions is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is ordered to submit to an independent medical examination within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 8, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court