Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 13:19:25 (UTC).

MANUEL MACIAS VS HYUNDAE GLOBAL EXPRESS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2014 MANUEL MACIAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HYUNDAE GLOBAL EXPRESS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4762

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MACIAS MANUEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HYUN DAE TRUCKING & SHIPPING INC.

HYUN DAE TRUCKING CO. INC.

HYUNDAE GLOBAL EXPRESS INC.

WOORI SHIPPING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RASTEGAR FARZAD ESQ.

DOUGLAS W. PERLMAN

PERLMAN DOUGLAS W.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KIM JASON J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

5/5/2014: SUMMONS -

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMACIES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

5/5/2014: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMACIES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

Declaration - DECLARATION AND ORDER DISMISSING PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION

3/9/2017: Declaration - DECLARATION AND ORDER DISMISSING PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 311; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION AND ORDER DISMISSING PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 311; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketPOSTING TO MESSAGE Message Title: Hearing continued to 3-22-17 10 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2014
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 311; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Woori Shipping, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manuel Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMACIES FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOORI SHIPPING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HYUN DAE TRUCKING & SHIPPING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JASON J. ESQ.