Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 18:54:37 (UTC).

MANUEL CANDELAS VS MAZIAR KHATIBI NEJAD FARD ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 MANUEL CANDELAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAZIAR KHATIBI NEJAD FARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, SERENA R. MURILLO and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4436

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

SERENA R. MURILLO

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CANDELAS MANUEL

Defendants and Respondents

KHATIBI AKBAR

DOES 1-25

FARD MAZIAR KHATIBI NEJAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CELLINO & BARNES LC

BELTY ANGELA MONIQUE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HARVEY KATHRYN JEANINE ESQ.

WESIERSKI CHRISTOPHER P. ESQ.

WESIERSKI CHRISTOPHER PAUL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DRUG TESTING OF DEFENDANT MAZIR KHATIBI NEJAD FARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF

6/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DRUG TESTING OF DEFENDANT MAZIR KHATIBI NEJAD FARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE 19

6/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE 19

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTTIFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE THAT PLAINTIFF WAS REFERRED TO DOCTORS BY AN ATTORNEY

6/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTTIFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE THAT PLAINTIFF WAS REFERRED TO DOCTORS BY AN ATTORNEY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE EVIDENCE OF FUTURE SURGERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHRY

6/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE EVIDENCE OF FUTURE SURGERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHRY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' UNCONTESTED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 REGARDING EXCLUSION OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHRYN J. HARVEY

6/7/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' UNCONTESTED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 REGARDING EXCLUSION OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHRYN J. HARVEY

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15

7/1/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR FELONY CONVICTIONS; DECLARATION OF KATHRYN J. HARVEY

7/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S PRIOR FELONY CONVICTIONS; DECLARATION OF KATHRYN J. HARVEY

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REDACTING INADVERTENTLY DISCLOSED PRIVATE INFORMATION

8/7/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REDACTING INADVERTENTLY DISCLOSED PRIVATE INFORMATION

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY FROM DR. FURST AND DR. LEDERHAUS REGARDING THE VALIDITY THE FEBRUARY 12, 2019 FUNCTI

11/19/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY FROM DR. FURST AND DR. LEDERHAUS REGARDING THE VALIDITY THE FEBRUARY 12, 2019 FUNCTI

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION; DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER P. WESIERSKI

11/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION; DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER P. WESIERSKI

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHRYN HARVEY.

12/15/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KATHRYN HARVEY.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER - DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REOPEN DI...)

12/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER - DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REOPEN DI...)

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

12/26/2017: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

PROOF OF SERVICE RE:OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE RE:OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF MANUEL CANDELAS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/11/2018: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF MANUEL CANDELAS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/11/2018: DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order -

5/16/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/11/2018: Minute Order -

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Long Cause Trial Determination) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review) OFF CALENDAR); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by Maziar Khatibi Nejad Fard (Defendant); Akbar Khatibi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by Maziar Khatibi Nejad Fard (Defendant); Akbar Khatibi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by Maziar Khatibi Nejad Fard (Defendant); Akbar Khatibi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 03/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((Long Cause)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
265 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Maziar Khatibi Nejad Fard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Maziar Khatibi Nejad Fard (Defendant); Akbar Khatibi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manuel Candelas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manuel Candelas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manuel Candelas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC634436    Hearing Date: December 22, 2020    Dept: 29

Candelas v. Fard, et al. BC634436

Defendants’ Motion to Reopen Discovery is GRANTED in part. Good cause having been shown, the court allows each side to serve a supplemental demand for production under Code of Civil Procedure section 2031.050 and a supplemental interrogatory under section 2030.070. Defendants may also serve subpoenas to medical providers for updated medical and billing records regarding any additional treatment for the injuries at issue in this matter.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.