Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 12:06:06 (UTC).

MANUEL ARGOMANIEZ ET AL VS ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/17/2012 MANUEL ARGOMANIEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8975

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ARGOMANIZ MANUEL

DOWELL TIMOTHY

NOLAN TIMOTHY

VILLALOBOS KEVIN

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NOLAN TIMOTHY

Defendants and Respondents

ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE INC.

ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE LLC

CELGENE CORPORATION

CHAN MICHELE B.

SOON

WIGGINTON RICHARD W.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

SOON-SHIONG PATRICK M.D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SOON-SHIONG PATRICK M.D.

Other

TYSON & MENDES LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HUNDLEY PAUL B. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LATHAM & WATKINS

TYSON & MENDES LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION AND RETAILATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

2/17/2012: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION AND RETAILATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT PATRICK SOONSHIONG?S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

4/20/2012: DEFENDANT PATRICK SOONSHIONG?S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

4/20/2012: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/11/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/11/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

6/26/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/29/2012: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

PROOFF OF SERVICE RE: CROSSDEFENDANTS? DEMURRER & [PROPOSEDI ORDER, MOTION TO STRIKE & PROPOSED ORDER

7/3/2012: PROOFF OF SERVICE RE: CROSSDEFENDANTS? DEMURRER & [PROPOSEDI ORDER, MOTION TO STRIKE & PROPOSED ORDER

CROSS-DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT; I1EMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/3/2012: CROSS-DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT; I1EMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

CROSS-DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

7/3/2012: CROSS-DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/11/2012: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/16/2012: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

Minute Order -

7/23/2012: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/13/2012: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

9/18/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

9/28/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12/12/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2013
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 28; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Manuel Argomaniz (Legacy Party); Kevin Villalobos (Legacy Party); Timothy Nolan (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 28; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT PATRICK SOONSHIONGS CORRECTED CROSSCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT PATRICK SOONSHIONGS CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Patrick, M.D. Soon-Shiong (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Patrick, M.D. Soon-Shiong (Legacy Party); Abraxis Bioscience, LLC (Defendant); Abraxis Bioscience, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Timothy Nolan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION AND RETAILATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Abraxis Bioscience, Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Tyson & Mendes LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CELGENE CORPORATION is a litigant