This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 08:26:29 (UTC).

MANSOUR GEORGE ET AL VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/12/2016 MANSOUR GEORGE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6488

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GEORGE MANSOUR

GEORGE ANAHIT ALICE

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

CORTINES RAMON E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SZABO GABOR ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/18/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF MARCOS F. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF THIRTY DAY EXTENSION TO MEET AND CONFER [CAL. COD CIV. PROC. ? 430.41 (A)(2)]

4/15/2016: DECLARATION OF MARCOS F. HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF THIRTY DAY EXTENSION TO MEET AND CONFER [CAL. COD CIV. PROC. ? 430.41 (A)(2)]

Unknown

5/6/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

5/11/2016: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) UNLAWFULLY WITHHOLDING PENSION BENEFITS; ETC.

5/31/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) UNLAWFULLY WITHHOLDING PENSION BENEFITS; ETC.

DECLARATION OF GABOR SZABO REGARDING THE COURT ORDERED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

6/1/2016: DECLARATION OF GABOR SZABO REGARDING THE COURT ORDERED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND RAMON C. CORTINES' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

7/18/2016: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND RAMON C. CORTINES' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

DEFENDANTS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND RAMON CORTINES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' ANTISLAPP MOTION AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20,654.00

7/21/2016: DEFENDANTS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND RAMON CORTINES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' ANTISLAPP MOTION AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20,654.00

BENCH BRIEF TO REDUCE OR ELIMINATE ATTORNEY FEE AWARD FOR THE DEFENSE

8/16/2016: BENCH BRIEF TO REDUCE OR ELIMINATE ATTORNEY FEE AWARD FOR THE DEFENSE

DEFENDANTS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND RAMON CORTINES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AWARD PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

8/18/2016: DEFENDANTS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND RAMON CORTINES' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AWARD PURSUANT TO DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND CORTINES' MOTTON FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

9/1/2016: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS, LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND CORTINES' MOTTON FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

ORDER

9/16/2016: ORDER

Unknown

9/16/2016: Unknown

Unknown

9/16/2016: Unknown

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/16/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

7/6/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DAVID V. GRECO RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JULY 6,2017 POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

7/12/2017: DECLARATION OF DAVID V. GRECO RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JULY 6,2017 POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF GABOR SZABO REGARDING THE COURT ORDERED OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/25/2017: DECLARATION OF GABOR SZABO REGARDING THE COURT ORDERED OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 31, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1000.00 AGAINSTALL PARTIES AND/OR THEIR COUNSELOF RECORD) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (E/A W/PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 31, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status ( (RE MSC )) - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 31, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (2) DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION(C/F 7-28-16)) - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Receipt (jury fees ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Receipt (jury fees ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Order-Case Management; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 31, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 31, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less