This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:42:42 (UTC).

MANOLO BORRUEL VS MAGID ABDALLA ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/09/2016 MANOLO BORRUEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAGID ABDALLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2321

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BORRUEL MANOLO

Defendants and Respondents

ABDALLA NADIA

DOES 1 TO20

ABDALLA MAGID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SARIOL FRANK

JERISAT MARTIN ELIAS ESQ.

GONZALEZ ANTONIO J

Defendant Attorneys

JONES ROBYN NIKIA ESQ.

BRYSON DAVID J ESQ.

WEISSMAN DAVID MAX ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/6/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/12/2019: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order

7/9/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, COMPEL PLAINTIFF, MANOLA BORRUEL TO ATTEND AND TESTIFY AT DEPOSITION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PROVIDE AN EXPEDITED HEARING DATE TO HAVE HEARD DEFENDANT

7/9/2018: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, COMPEL PLAINTIFF, MANOLA BORRUEL TO ATTEND AND TESTIFY AT DEPOSITION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PROVIDE AN EXPEDITED HEARING DATE TO HAVE HEARD DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE TRIAL DATE

7/27/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE TRIAL DATE

PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE TRIAL DATE OF AUGUST 21, 2018

7/27/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE TRIAL DATE OF AUGUST 21, 2018

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REINSTATE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE;AND ETC.

7/27/2018: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REINSTATE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE;AND ETC.

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE OF AUGUST 21, 2018 AND REQUEST F?OR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF DAVID WEISSMAN AN

8/14/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE OF AUGUST 21, 2018 AND REQUEST F?OR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF DAVID WEISSMAN AN

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REINSTATE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE OF 8/21/18; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

8/24/2018: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REINSTATE THE ORIGINAL TRIAL DATE OF 8/21/18; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY

9/21/2018: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY

Minute Order

11/19/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/29/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

2/7/2019: Opposition

SUMMONS

12/9/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/23/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Pursuant to Stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 1:39 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Magid Abdalla (Defendant); Nadia Abdalla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manolo Borruel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Manolo Borruel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Manolo Borruel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC642321    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 29

Borruel v. Abdalla et al.

Defendant’s Motion to Strike and/or Tax Costs is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. On 9/11/19, this action was transferred for trial to the Alhambra courthouse, Department NE3, Judge A. Tamzarian. The motion is properly directed to that department.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.