Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:24:10 (UTC).

MALYSHA ROBBYN CASTRO VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 MALYSHA ROBBYN CASTRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4362

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CASTRO MALYSHA ROBBYN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

KITAKIS MATTHEW NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AMOSCATO ANTHONY M.

BREDLAU RICHARD R.

Defendant Attorneys

CAMPBELL GLENN J.

RODMAN DANIEL S. ESQ.

HANSEN DAVID PAUL

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/3/2018: Unknown

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

2/26/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

Minute Order

2/26/2018: Minute Order

ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

3/20/2018: ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DECLARATION OF SARAH M. AYAD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

8/27/2018: DECLARATION OF SARAH M. AYAD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/20/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

12/20/2018: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

12/20/2018: Declaration

Answer

3/18/2019: Answer

Order

3/25/2019: Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

3/25/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Ex Parte Application

3/25/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/25/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY, STRICT LIABILITY IN TORT, NEGLIGENCE, BREACH OF WARRANTY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

12/20/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY, STRICT LIABILITY IN TORT, NEGLIGENCE, BREACH OF WARRANTY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

Answer

7/28/2017: Answer

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and FSC Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and FSC Dates)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Order (By the Court granting ex parte application to continue trial and related dates.); Filed by Matthew Nicholas Kitakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and FSC Dates); Filed by Matthew Nicholas Kitakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Matthew Nicholas Kitakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Answer (of Matthew Nicholas Kitakis' to Complaint); Filed by Matthew Nicholas Kitakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Malysha Robbyn Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY, STRICT LIABILITY IN TORT, NEGLIGENCE, BREACH OF WARRANTY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Malysha Robbyn Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC644362    Hearing Date: January 08, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MALYSHA ROBBYN CASTRO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC644362

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

January 8, 2021

Defendant, Ford Motor Company (“Ford”) propounded form interrogatories, set one, on co-defendant, Matthew Nicholas Kitakis (“Kitakis “) on 5/13/20. To date, despite an extension of time to respond and attempts to meet and confer, Kitakis has not served responses. Ford therefore seeks an order compelling Kitakis to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

Ford’s motion to compel is granted. Kitakis is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, set one, without objections, within ten days. (CCP § 2030.290(a),(b).)

Sanctions are mandatory. (CCP §§ 2030.290(c), 2031.300(c).) Ford seeks sanctions in the amount of $1,717.50 for the motion against Kitakis. However, Ford does not describe any conduct by Kitakis warranting sanctions against Kitakis directly. Rather, Ford’s evidence shows the subject discovery was served on, and meet and confer attempts were made with, Kitakis’s counsel. However, no sanctions are sought against Kitakis’s counsel. The court, therefore, finds sanctions are not warranted under the circumstances.

Moving Defendant Ford is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 8th day of January, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSEN DAVID PAUL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campbell, Glenn J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODMAN DANIEL S. ESQ.