This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 00:01:57 (UTC).

MAGUED MAKRAM YAFT VS TBI AIRPORT MANAGEMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/14/2012 MAGUED MAKRAM YAFT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TBI AIRPORT MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4683

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YAFT MAGUE MAKRAM

Defendants and Respondents

AIRPORT CONCESSIONS AND DEVELOPMENT LIMI

FEGER DAN

HATANAKA JOHN T.

TBI AIRPORT MANAGEMENT INC.

TBI LIMITED

TBI LLC

TBI US OPERATIONS INC.

AIRPORT CONCESSIONS AND DEVELOPMENT LIMI-

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RAGER JEFFERY A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NOVICK MINDY S. ESQ.

ROMANELLO RACHEL L.

WILSON ROXANNE M. ESQ.

ZUCKERMAN ALAN R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

5/17/2012: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/21/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT TBI U.S. OPERATIONS, INC.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS ACTION AGAINST I

8/20/2012: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT TBI U.S. OPERATIONS, INC.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS ACTION AGAINST I

NOTICE OF LODGING OF COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAN FEGER?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MAGUED MAKRAM YAFT?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/28/2012: NOTICE OF LODGING OF COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DAN FEGER?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MAGUED MAKRAM YAFT?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/7/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/7/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT TBI U.S. OPERATIONS, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS ACTION AGAINST I

3/7/2013: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT TBI U.S. OPERATIONS, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND DISMISS ACTION AGAINST I

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH OR LIMIT DEPOSITION RECORDS SUBPOENA OFF CALENDER

8/2/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO QUASH OR LIMIT DEPOSITION RECORDS SUBPOENA OFF CALENDER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/2/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/17/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

1/27/2014: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE DISCUSSION OF PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS AND SEPARATION FROM THE LAKEWOOD COLORADO POLICE DEPARTMENT

3/5/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE DISCUSSION OF PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS AND SEPARATION FROM THE LAKEWOOD COLORADO POLICE DEPARTMENT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO EDD BENEFITS

3/6/2014: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO EDD BENEFITS

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE KENNY WONG?S COMPLAINTS TO TBI; EXHIBIT; DECLARATION OF RACHEL L. ROMANELLO [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 OF 7]

3/11/2014: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE KENNY WONG?S COMPLAINTS TO TBI; EXHIBIT; DECLARATION OF RACHEL L. ROMANELLO [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 OF 7]

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE MARY LUGO?S COMPLAINTS TO TB!; EXHIBIT; DECLARATION OF RACHEL L. ROMANELLO (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 OF 7]

3/11/2014: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE MARY LUGO?S COMPLAINTS TO TB!; EXHIBIT; DECLARATION OF RACHEL L. ROMANELLO (MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 OF 7]

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL. DATE: MAY 14.2014

4/4/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL. DATE: MAY 14.2014

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Mague Makram Yaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by TBI Airport Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mague Makram Yaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL. DATE: MAY 14.2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Mague Makram Yaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 42; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mague Makram Yaft (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TBI is a litigant

Latest cases where TBI Airport Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANELLO RACHEL L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVICK MINDY S. ESQ.