Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:24:39 (UTC).

MAGDALENA GUTIERREZ VS KIM ESPINOZA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2016 MAGDALENA GUTIERREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIM ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6554

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Cross Defendant and Appellant

GUTIERREZ MAGDALENA

Defendants and Respondents

SUNSET GARDENS WEST

ESPINOZA KIM

DOES 1 TO 25

RICKBEARY INC.

RICBERAY INC.

SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK

BENDER BRUCE W. [DOE 1]

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

RICBERAY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SANTANA ARTURO

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY BEAM & ASSOCIATES INC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/7/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT BY KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK; DECLARATION OF NORMAN PAUL BREEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/4/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT BY KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK; DECLARATION OF NORMAN PAUL BREEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order

2/9/2017: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/16/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME)

3/28/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME)

NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK; ETC

4/6/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK; ETC

DECLARATION OF NORMAN PAUL BREEN RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41 (A)(3) IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS BY KIM ESPINOZA AND ETC

4/6/2017: DECLARATION OF NORMAN PAUL BREEN RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 430.41 (A)(3) IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS BY KIM ESPINOZA AND ETC

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY INC.

4/24/2017: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/19/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK

5/24/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK

DECLARATION OF SETH COPELAND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT BRUCE BENDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/5/2017: DECLARATION OF SETH COPELAND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT BRUCE BENDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE MOBILEHOME RESIDENCY LAW 2. TRESPASS 3. DECLARTORY RELIEF

6/23/2017: ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF THE MOBILEHOME RESIDENCY LAW 2. TRESPASS 3. DECLARTORY RELIEF

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC.'S DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT

7/10/2017: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS KIM ESPINOZA AND RICBERAY, INC.'S DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT

APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS'/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

8/11/2017: APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS'/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS'/CROSS-. COMPLAINANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9/27/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS'/CROSS-. COMPLAINANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

10/27/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Amended/Corrected Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICBERAY INC. DBA SUNSET GARDENS-WEST MOBILEHOME PARK is a litigant