This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 05:46:10 (UTC).

MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC VS CLARIUS ASIG,LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2015 MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLARIUS ASIG,LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD ROSENBERG and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4055

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD ROSENBERG

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC

BIGTS LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

CLARIUS ASIG LLC

CLARIUS BIGS LLC

CLARIUS CAPITAL GROUP LLC

CLARIUS CAPTIAL INC

CLARIUS ENTERTAINMENT LLC

CLARIUS RELEASING LLC

WILLIAM SADLEIR

SADLEIR WILLIAM

Other

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO

Not Classified By Court

ROBB EVANS & ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIRMAN ALAN M.

BIGTS LOAN SERVICE LLC A DELAWARE LTD

Defendant Attorneys

LOEB AND LOEB

WEINTRAUB TOBIN CHEDIAK COLEMAN GRODIN

GRODIN WEINTRAUB TOBIN CHEDIAK COLEMAN

Other Attorneys

AUGUST MARSHALL JAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/8/2016: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

1/19/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation

4/29/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation

Status Report -

7/10/2018: Status Report -

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-17 00:00:00

7/17/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-07-17 00:00:00

Status Report

1/19/2017: Status Report

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

1/3/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Miscellaneous-Other

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00

1/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-07-18 00:00:00

7/18/2016: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2016-07-18 00:00:00

Stipulated Judgment

9/4/2019: Stipulated Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALAN M. MIRMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

7/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALAN M. MIRMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Status Report

7/22/2019: Status Report

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT)

8/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

9/18/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2019

9/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2019

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department K; Jury Trial (with a 4 day estimate) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment of September 4, 2019); Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department K; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Judgement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketStipulated Judgment; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Judgement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Judgement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff); Bigts Loan Servicing, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR SPECIALLY SETTING A HEARING ON A MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN ...); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-04-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MACQUARIE US TRADING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLARIUS RELEASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO is a litigant

Latest cases where Robb Evans & Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer August, Marshall J