This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 16:57:44 (UTC).

M & O HOLDINGS, LLC VS. EDWIN ESTUARDO REYES

Case Summary

On 05/13/2014 M O HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against EDWIN ESTUARDO REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7845

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&O HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 5

REYES EDWIN ESTUARDO

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER & FLOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • Writ of Execution filed (for the County of Los Angeles. Possession only. Att serv/Buck slip) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • Application - Miscellaneous (for Issuance of Writ of Possession ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • ExParte Application (to have judgment entered upon sitpulation for entry of judgment upon default ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Default Entered (AGAINST ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Notice of Status Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&O HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant