This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 19:06:17 (UTC).

M CORNEJO ET AL VS SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/26/2014 M CORNEJO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0705

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORNEJO M.

GARCIA D.

Defendants

PACIFIC ORTHOPEDIC MEDICAL GROUP

PAK SHANE S. M.D.

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

9/28/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

9/9/2015: Minute Order -

SUMMONS -

3/26/2014: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT 1. WRONGFUL DEATH (CCP SECTION 377.60); ETC

3/26/2014: COMPLAINT 1. WRONGFUL DEATH (CCP SECTION 377.60); ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. WRONGFUL DEATH (CCP SECTION 377.60); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by M. Cornejo (Plaintiff); D. Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant