This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:15:34 (UTC).

LY, BINH V VS LY, BAO N

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 LY, BINH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VS LY, BAO N. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4019

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LY BINH V

Respondent

LY BAO N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

JIANG HELEN B

JIANG HELEN BING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Stipulation - Establish or Modify Child Support and Order (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh - Signed on 2016-12-07 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-16-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ly, Binh - Granted on 2016-11-28 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less