This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2015 at 23:45:21 (UTC).

LUZ P MALUNDO VS EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2009 LUZ P MALUNDO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RITA MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9652

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RITA MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALUNDO LUZ P.

Defendants

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

12/30/2009: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

10/21/2011: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

3/30/2010: SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF ROMAN P. MOSQUEDA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

3/30/2010: DECLARATION OF ROMAN P. MOSQUEDA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/30/2009: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

1/11/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/1/2010: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/30/2010: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

JUDGMENT

3/30/2010: JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/19/2009: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

8/12/2009: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

9/25/2009: NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

3/30/2010: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

SUMMONS

8/12/2009: SUMMONS

MINUTE ORDER

3/30/2010: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/2/2009: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

3/30/2010: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED; RETURNED VIA MAIL ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROMAN P. MOSQUEDA ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Declaration (PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Judgment Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Request to Enter Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (DOE DEFTS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • Default Entered (AS EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.