This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2016 at 08:02:42 (UTC).

LUSTAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION VS JOHN RHEE

Case Summary

On 09/05/2013 LUSTAR INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN RHEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OKI, DAN THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6301

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OKI, DAN THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUSTAR INTERNATIONAL CORP.

Defendants

BLACK DIAMOND GROUP

BLACK DIAMOND GROUP ENTERPRISES INC.

RHEE JOHN

UENO CHUCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOM TRAVIS J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (Complaint as to: Defendant Chuck Ueno ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Declaration (OF JESSE LU IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Dismissal of Does Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Request for Court Judgment-Default Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Judgment (BY COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • Notice of Stay (AS TO DEFT. CHUCK UENO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Default Entered (COURT JUDGMENT SENT TO DEPT J W/O FILE ON 2/26/14 (HRG 3/26/14) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (JOHN RHEE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BLACK DIAMOND GRP. ENTERPRISES INC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BLACK DIAMOND GRP. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACK DIAMOND GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOM TRAVIS JAMES