This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2021 at 23:40:53 (UTC).

LUPE GARCIA VS CECILIA LUNA SANCHEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 LUPE GARCIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CECILIA LUNA SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6207

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Petitioner

GARCIA LUPE

Respondents and Defendants

SANCHEZ CECILIA LUNA

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CERVIK ANDREW

CERVIK ANDREW BRADLEY

Defendant Attorney

MACCARLEY LISA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF FIRST AMENDMENT TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FIRST AMENDMENT TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CECILIA DE LUNA SANCHEZ, INDIVIDUAL...) OF 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CECILIA DE LUNA SANCHEZ, INDIVIDUAL...) OF 01/28/2020

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LISA MACCARLEY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR PARTITION BY SALE

7/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LISA MACCARLEY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR PARTITION BY SALE

Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

8/31/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

11/12/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER

5/18/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER

Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL EVIDENCE REGARDING EXPENSES FOR THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTIES

6/7/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL EVIDENCE REGARDING EXPENSES FOR THE SUBJECT REAL PROPERTIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order -

4/24/2018: Minute Order -

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

3/2/2017: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OR ALL OF THE VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION

3/17/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OR ALL OF THE VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF COURT RECORDS

4/6/2017: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF COURT RECORDS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RECTIFYING CLERICAL ERROR REGARDING THE FAX FILING OF THE OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND ETC

5/8/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RECTIFYING CLERICAL ERROR REGARDING THE FAX FILING OF THE OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND ETC

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 Volume Certified; for Notice of Appeal, filed 10/28/20; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketExhibit List (JOINT); Filed by Lupe Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWitness List (JOINT); Filed by Lupe Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 19; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 19; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Lupe Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketExhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT); Filed by Lupe Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN AGREEMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC626207    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: 19

The hearing on Defendant and Cross-Complainant Cecelia Luna Sanchez’s Motion for Summary Adjudication By Partition Sale is CONTINUED to September 15, 2020, at 8:30 a.m., Department 19, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. The Court needs additional time to review the briefing submitted by the parties.

On its own motion, the Court also advances and vacates the Final Status Conference set for September 15, 2020 and the Court Trial set for September 22, 2020, in light of COVID-19 restrictions and the recent General Orders from the Presiding Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court. (Code of Civ. Proc. section 128).

The Court sets a Trial Setting Conference for September 15, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

Counsel for Defendant to give notice.