Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2020 at 20:53:57 (UTC).

SHARON D. LUND TRUST F/B/O MICHELLE A. LUND

Case Summary

On 10/20/2009 SHARON D LUND TRUST F/B/O MICHELLE A LUND was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L., STRATTON, MARIA E., LEVANAS, MICHAEL I., KWAN, RUTH ANN and COWAN, DAVID J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9204

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.

KWAN, RUTH ANN

COWAN, DAVID J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

STRODE DOUGLAS M.

LUND BRADFORD D.

LUND WILLIAM S.

GIFFORD L. ANDREW

FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY

WILSON ROBERT L.

Petitioners and Respondents

FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY

LUND SHERRY

DEW JIM

Not Classified By Court

LUND MICHELLE A.

LUND SHARON D.

SHARON D. LUND TRUST F/B/O MICHELLE A. LUND

WRIGHT KIM DOUGLAS A LAW CORPORATION

Interested Parties and Respondents

LUND SHERRY

DEW JIM

Other

LUND BRADFORD D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

BENGALI OMAR H

BUSCH JOSEPH PETER III

SPITSER ANDREW CULP

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

SPITSER ANDREW CULP

WRIGHT LAURIANN

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

WRIGHT LAURIANN

Other Attorney

LODISE MARGARET GLAHN

Other Attorneys

CUTROW ALLAN B. ESQ

RAJAN NAHLA BAHADURALI

HUESTON JOHN C. ESQ

MATSEN JEFFREY R. ESQ

NELSON DAVID C. ESQ

BOHM JAMES G. ESQ

DE COSTA KARL ESQ

CHOY L. MICHELLE

GELBLUM PETER B.

 

Court Documents

OTHER - PETITION OF CONTINGENT BENEFICIARY BRAD D. LUND FOR BREACH OF TRUST AGAINST CO-TRUSTEES FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY, L. ANDREW GIFFORD, AND ROBERT L. WILSON, SEEKING: ETC.

2/16/2010: OTHER - PETITION OF CONTINGENT BENEFICIARY BRAD D. LUND FOR BREACH OF TRUST AGAINST CO-TRUSTEES FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY, L. ANDREW GIFFORD, AND ROBERT L. WILSON, SEEKING: ETC.

OTHER - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. LUND IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/21/2010: OTHER - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. LUND IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

OTHER - OBJECTION TO JOINDER IN MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/16/2010: OTHER - OBJECTION TO JOINDER IN MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order

7/22/2010: Minute Order

OTHER - FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR REDRESS FOR BREACH OF TRUST

7/30/2010: OTHER - FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR REDRESS FOR BREACH OF TRUST

OTHER - RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR INSTRUCTION RE: APPROVAL OF TRUSTEES' MAJORITY DECISION DENYING CURRENT TRUST PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES INCURRED BY RESPONDENT, WILLIAM S. LUND; AND PETITI

8/9/2010: OTHER - RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PETITION FOR INSTRUCTION RE: APPROVAL OF TRUSTEES' MAJORITY DECISION DENYING CURRENT TRUST PAYMENT OF LEGAL FEES INCURRED BY RESPONDENT, WILLIAM S. LUND; AND PETITI

OTHER - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

9/21/2010: OTHER - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Notice of Hearing (Probate)

12/5/2013: Notice of Hearing (Probate)

Application - Appear Pro Hac Vice - Application for Sandra Slaton for Pro Hac Vice

9/5/2017: Application - Appear Pro Hac Vice - Application for Sandra Slaton for Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - Declaration of Sandra Slaton Re: Urgency & Notice in Support

1/4/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Sandra Slaton Re: Urgency & Notice in Support

Minute Order

6/25/2019: Minute Order

Order - - Further Rulings on Petition for Approval of Settlement Agrement; Amended Petition for Appointment of Replacement Trustee; And OSC re Guardian ad Litem

9/27/2019: Order - - Further Rulings on Petition for Approval of Settlement Agrement; Amended Petition for Appointment of Replacement Trustee; And OSC re Guardian ad Litem

Opposition - To Motion To Disqualify The Appointed Guardian Ad Litem Margaret Lodise

11/19/2019: Opposition - To Motion To Disqualify The Appointed Guardian Ad Litem Margaret Lodise

Minute Order

11/22/2019: Minute Order

Opposition - Opposition To Motion to Seal

4/29/2020: Opposition - Opposition To Motion to Seal

Statement - Statement

6/16/2020: Statement - Statement

Miscellaneous Document - Volume 4 Of 9. EXHIBITS TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF REVISED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO APPOINT REPLACEMENT TRUSTEE VOLUME 4 OF 9

6/17/2020: Miscellaneous Document - Volume 4 Of 9. EXHIBITS TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF REVISED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO APPOINT REPLACEMENT TRUSTEE VOLUME 4 OF 9

Miscellaneous Document - Volume 3 Of 9. EXHIBITS TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF REVISED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO APPOINT REPLACEMENT TRUSTEE VOLUME 3 OF 9

6/17/2020: Miscellaneous Document - Volume 3 Of 9. EXHIBITS TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF REVISED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO APPOINT REPLACEMENT TRUSTEE VOLUME 3 OF 9

321 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketResponse (Response to Objections to Petition to Approve ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketExhibit List (Corrected Exhibits to Petition to Approve Settlement Agreement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketExhibit List (Corrected Exhibits to Petition to Approve ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department; Motion Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department; Motion Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department; Motion Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department; Motion Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department; Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
367 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2009
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DocketResponse (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DocketReceipt (Filed by: Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DocketPetition - Pursuant to Probate Code Sec 17200 (FOR REDRESS FOR BREACH OF TRUST; SUSPEND POWERS; MONETARY SURCHARGE 1st Hearing Date: 02/23/2010 Filed By: Lund, William S., Petitioner Repres By: Matsen, Jeffrey R., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Bohm, James G., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 3 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • DocketReceipt (Filed by: Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Civil deposit for issuing 9 commis sions in the amount of $270.00 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (CITATION Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • DocketNotice (OF APPEARANCE & REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed By: First Republic Trust Company, Petitioner Filed By: Gifford, L. Andrew, Petitioner Filed By: Wilson, Robert L., Petitioner Repres By: Cutrow, Allan B., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Gelblum, Peter B., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: De Costa, Karl, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Rajan, Nahla Bahadurali, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketPetition - Pursuant to Probate Code Sec 17200 (1st Hearing Date: 01/21/2010 Filed By: First Republic Trust Company, Petitioner Filed By: Gifford, L. Andrew, Petitioner Filed By: Wilson, Robert L., Petitioner Repres By: Cutrow, Allan B., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Gelblum, Peter B., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: De Costa, Karl, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Rajan, Nahla Bahadurali, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BP119204    Hearing Date: January 30, 2020    Dept: 1

#1 – In re: The Lillian B. Disney Trust (BP055495)

#2 – In re: The Sharon D. Lund 1986 Irrevocable Trust (BP129815)

#3 – In re: The Bradford Disney Lund 1992 Trust (BP129814)

#4 – In re: The Sharon D. Lund Residuary Trust (BP119204)

#5 – In re: The Sharon D. Lund Residuary Trust (BP119205) 

On December 12, 2019, Judge David J. Cowan, sitting in probate Department 3 of the Stanley Mosk courthouse issued the following order in the five related probate cases captioned above: 

Effective February 3, 2020, Judge Cowan is reassigned to a Civil courtroom, Dept. 20 of this same courthouse. In view of the fact that he is in the middle of hearing two highly contested petitions, and in the interests of judicial economy, the Court believes it is obligated to conclude the disposition of those petitions, as well as hearing the report of the guardian ad litem associated with those petitions, and any all related issues or motions arising therefrom, including but not limited to any objections thereto, in order to facilitate and reduce the time and expense of resolution of these long standing cases. 

Judge Cowan does not at this time believe he will have sufficient time, however, with the Civil cases he is assigned, to hear any trials of the underlying contested accounting petition and or other related petitions in these cases were those to have to go forward. 

Accordingly, all future hearing dates on or after February 3, 2020 in these related cases will now be heard in Dept. 20, including the hearing now set for February 28, 2020. The hearing on February 28, 2020 will be at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are advised that Civil courtrooms do not have a court reporter assigned. Counsel are required to bring their own if they wish to have a record of the oral proceedings. 

(Dec. 12, 2019 Min. Order.) On January 2, 2020, Judge Cowan issued an order noting, in relevant part, “[t]he court previously stated, by minute order filed December 12, 2019, that the re-assignment to a different courtroom was solely for purposes of judicial economy to complete the pending petitions for approval of settlement agreement and for appointment of replacement trustees and issues associated therewith as to which this judge has already made preliminary rulings as to complex matters as well as avoid any issues arising from two judges hearing the same petitions.” 

On January 2, 2020, Bradford D. Lund and the Co-Trustees of The Bradford Disney Lund 1992 Trust, Sherry Lund and Jim Dew filed identical documents entitled “Joint Motion to Reassign Probate Proceeding Back to Probate Division from Civil Division” in each of the five probate cases with the hearing set in Department 1. On January 16, 2020, First Republic Trust Company filed its opposition in each case, and the movants filed their reply on January 23, 2020 in each case. As the motions, oppositions, and replies are identical in all five cases, the court will address them together and refer to the motions collectively as a single motion. 

The earliest-filed probate case, BP055495, was filed in the Los Angeles Superior Court on March 16, 1999. On August 15, 2018, Judge Maria E. Stratton issued an order assigning the five related cases to Judge Cowan for all purposes. The court notes, as argued by First Republic in opposition, moving party Bradford D. Lund has filed two unsuccessful challenges to Judge Cowan within the last four months: an October 16, 2019 challenge pursuant to CCP § 170.1 and a December 27, 2019 challenge pursuant to CCP § 170.6. Accordingly, the instant motion requesting a reassignment of the cases from Judge Cowan’s civil department appears to be an exercise in judge-shopping, particularly in light of Judge Cowan’s January 2, 2020 order that sets forth noting the limited remaining issues upon which he intends to rule. 

Movants note their motion is brought “assuming that matters stayed on appeal can be reassigned to a new department while awaiting appeal.” (Mo. at 7.) Movants provide no authority addressing this issue as Probate Code § 1300(a) defines only one type of appealable probate order. (Prob. Code § 1300(a) (“In all proceedings governed by this code, an appeal may be taken from the making of, or the refusal to make, any of the following orders: (a) Directing, authorizing, approving, or confirming the sale, lease, encumbrance, grant of an option, purchase, conveyance, or exchange of property.”).) However, the administrative reassignment of an action between departments of a superior court does not appear to fall within the scope of the relevant statutes governing stays pending appeal. (CCP §§ 916 et seq; Prob. Code § 1310.)

Movants argue that a civil department lacks jurisdiction to hear a probate matter and cannot handle the complexities of these probate cases. Movants also argue that Judge Cowan’s order violated the Local Rules of the Los Angeles Superior Court, deprived the parties of their right to a court reporter, and failed to honor Movants’ due process rights. Thus, the motion seeks to reverse Judge Cowan’s December 12, 2019 order based upon legal error and asks this court to make contrary findings regarding whether judicial economy is best served by Judge Cowan temporarily retaining these probate cases. Accordingly, the court finds the instant motion constitutes an untimely and improper motion for reconsideration. (CCP § 1008.)

Moreover, neither Department 1, nor any other judicial officer of this court, has the authority to reverse Judge Cowan’s order on the grounds raised by Movants. (Geddes v. Superior Court (2005) 126 Cal.App.4th 417, 425–426 (“one trial judge may not review the ruling of another trial judge because the superior court, although comprised of many judges, is a single court.”); People v. Woodard (1982) 131 Cal.App.3d 107, 111 (“The Superior Court of Los Angeles County, though comprised of a number of judges, is a single court and one member of that court cannot sit in review on the actions of another member of that same court.”).)

The Joint Motion to Reassign Probate Proceeding Back to Probate Division from Civil Division filed in BP055495, BP129815, BP129814, BP119204, and BP119205 is DENIED in its entirety.

Counsel for First Republic Trust Company to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHARON D. LUND TRUST F/B/O MICHELLE A. LUND is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATSEN JEFFREY ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE COSTA KARL