Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 02:08:37 (UTC).

SHARON D. LUND RESIDUARY TRUST FBO BRADFORD D. LUND

Case Summary

On 10/20/2009 SHARON D LUND RESIDUARY TRUST FBO BRADFORD D LUND was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L., STRATTON, MARIA E., GOETZ, REVA, MURPHY, DANIEL S., KWAN, RUTH ANN, COWAN, DAVID J. and PAUL, ROY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9205

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

GOETZ, REVA

MURPHY, DANIEL S.

KWAN, RUTH ANN

COWAN, DAVID J.

PAUL, ROY L.

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

SCHEMITSCH RACHEL

LOVEJOY SABRINA

LUND WILLIAM S.

GIFFORD L. ANDREW

WILSON ROBERT L.

MUTUAL OF OMAHA BANK

FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY

LUND SHERRY

DEW JIM

FIRST REPUBLIC SECURITIES COMPANY LLC

Appellants, Guardian Ad Litems and Others

LUND BRADFORD D.

LODISE ESQ. MARGARET G.

Respondents

STRODE DOUGLAS M.

LUND MICHELLE A.

FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY

LUND SHERRY

DEW JIM

Interested Party

SHARON D. LUND FOUNDATION

Not Classified By Court

LUND SHARON D.

JUDGE JOHN W. OUDERKIRK

SUPERIOR COURT

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC

Trustee

WRIGHT LAURIANN - Attorney for Co

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

CUTROW ALLAN BARRY

GELBLUM PETER BURR

KAISER HAYWARD JOHN

CARRIDO MELINDA M.

RAJAN NAHLA BAHADURALI

DECOSTA KARL J

SPITSER ANDREW CULP

WRIGHT LAURIANN

BOHM JAMES GLENN

PENNER STEPHEN ERNEST

ULWELLING JAMES KASPER

HENDRICKS ED JR

NELSON DAVID CAMERON

Appellant and Other Attorneys

BENGALI OMAR H

THOREEN VIVIAN LEE

LODISE MARGARET GLAHN

TRONCALI MATTHEW ALEXANDER

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

FALCONE LINDSEE BLAIR

GROBATY MICHAEL JOHN

Petitioner and Other Attorneys

BOHM JAMES GLENN

BENGALI OMAR H

THOREEN VIVIAN LEE

LODISE MARGARET GLAHN

TRONCALI MATTHEW ALEXANDER

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

FALCONE LINDSEE BLAIR

GROBATY MICHAEL JOHN

Appellant, Guardian Ad Litem and Other Attorney

LODISE MARGARET GLAHN

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - PERSONAL

6/26/2012: Proof of Service - PERSONAL

Minute Order

8/19/2013: Minute Order

OTHER - BRADFORD D. LUND S NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPTS

11/26/2013: OTHER - BRADFORD D. LUND S NOTICE OF LODGING TRANSCRIPTS

OTHER - PARTIES JOINT TRIAL STATEMENT, ETC...

11/26/2013: OTHER - PARTIES JOINT TRIAL STATEMENT, ETC...

Reply - Of Petiioner And Beneficiary To Respondent Trustees' Opposition To Bradford Lund's Motion For Reconsideration, Etc..

1/3/2017: Reply - Of Petiioner And Beneficiary To Respondent Trustees' Opposition To Bradford Lund's Motion For Reconsideration, Etc..

Minute Order

6/30/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

Notice - Notice of Entry of Order on Respondents' Ex Parte to Continue Deadline to File Response and Objection to Petitioner's Fourth Amended Petition

6/8/2018: Notice - Notice of Entry of Order on Respondents' Ex Parte to Continue Deadline to File Response and Objection to Petitioner's Fourth Amended Petition

Objection - Trust Petition

7/17/2018: Objection - Trust Petition

Declaration - Corrected Declarations and Exhibits iso TRO Appl (Buza)

8/16/2018: Declaration - Corrected Declarations and Exhibits iso TRO Appl (Buza)

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

8/23/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order

8/29/2018: Minute Order

Declaration - of Sandra Slaton, Esq. In Support of Petitioner Bradford D. Lund's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to COntinue All Matters Scheudled to Be Heard on February 7, 2019

1/7/2019: Declaration - of Sandra Slaton, Esq. In Support of Petitioner Bradford D. Lund's Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to COntinue All Matters Scheudled to Be Heard on February 7, 2019

Minute Order

6/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/25/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order - Matter Taken Under Submission

9/13/2019: Minute Order - Matter Taken Under Submission

Minute Order

12/4/2019: Minute Order

Objection - PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO PRELIMINARY REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARGARET G. LODISE, ESQ

2/5/2020: Objection - PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO PRELIMINARY REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARGARET G. LODISE, ESQ

1,733 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid (TRNSCRB Fund ); Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal; "U2" ); Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Record on Appeal Elected/Designated (Clerk Transcript; Reporter Transcript; "U2" ); Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT BRADFORD D. LUND )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued ("U2" Fail to File Designation/Election; Fail to Pay: REPORTER TRANSCRIPT FEES AND DEPOSIT )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketResponse (Trustees' Response to Bradford Lund's (Unverified) Third Statement )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Preliminary Objection To Michael Seibert's Petition For Expert s Fees And Attorney Compensation; and Request for Evidentiary Hearing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Conditional Objection To Petition For Approval Of Guardian Ad Litem Fees And Declaration for Margaret G. Lodise, Esq.; and Request for Evidentiary Hearing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docketin Non Probate Department, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
2,128 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2010
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding; Removal Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • DocketResponse (& OBJECTION OF BENEFICIARY BRADFORD D. LUND TO PETN FOR REDRESS FOR BREACH OF TRUST Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DocketResponse (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DocketPetition - Removal (Redress for Breach of Trust; Suspend Powers; Monetary Surcharge 1st Hearing Date: 02/22/2010 Filed By: Lund, William S., Petitioner Repres By: Bohm, James G., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Matsen, Jeffrey R., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 5 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (CITATION (PROBATE) Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • DocketNotice (OF APPEARANCE & REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed By: First Republic Trust Company, Petitioner Filed By: Gifford, L. Andrew, Petitioner Filed By: Wilson, Robert L., Petitioner Repres By: Cutrow, Allan B., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Gelblum, Peter B., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: de Costa, Karl, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Rajan, Nahla Bahadurali, Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketPetition - Removal (1st Hearing Date: 01/11/2010 Filed By: First Republic Trust Company, Petitioner Filed By: Gifford, L. Andrew, Petitioner Filed By: Wilson, Robert L., Petitioner Repres By: Cutrow, Allan B., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Gelblum, Peter B., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: de Costa, Karl, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Rajan, Nahla Bahadurali, Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BP119205    Hearing Date: January 30, 2020    Dept: 1

#1 – In re: The Lillian B. Disney Trust (BP055495)

#2 – In re: The Sharon D. Lund 1986 Irrevocable Trust (BP129815)

#3 – In re: The Bradford Disney Lund 1992 Trust (BP129814)

#4 – In re: The Sharon D. Lund Residuary Trust (BP119204)

#5 – In re: The Sharon D. Lund Residuary Trust (BP119205) 

On December 12, 2019, Judge David J. Cowan, sitting in probate Department 3 of the Stanley Mosk courthouse issued the following order in the five related probate cases captioned above: 

Effective February 3, 2020, Judge Cowan is reassigned to a Civil courtroom, Dept. 20 of this same courthouse. In view of the fact that he is in the middle of hearing two highly contested petitions, and in the interests of judicial economy, the Court believes it is obligated to conclude the disposition of those petitions, as well as hearing the report of the guardian ad litem associated with those petitions, and any all related issues or motions arising therefrom, including but not limited to any objections thereto, in order to facilitate and reduce the time and expense of resolution of these long standing cases. 

Judge Cowan does not at this time believe he will have sufficient time, however, with the Civil cases he is assigned, to hear any trials of the underlying contested accounting petition and or other related petitions in these cases were those to have to go forward. 

Accordingly, all future hearing dates on or after February 3, 2020 in these related cases will now be heard in Dept. 20, including the hearing now set for February 28, 2020. The hearing on February 28, 2020 will be at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are advised that Civil courtrooms do not have a court reporter assigned. Counsel are required to bring their own if they wish to have a record of the oral proceedings. 

(Dec. 12, 2019 Min. Order.) On January 2, 2020, Judge Cowan issued an order noting, in relevant part, “[t]he court previously stated, by minute order filed December 12, 2019, that the re-assignment to a different courtroom was solely for purposes of judicial economy to complete the pending petitions for approval of settlement agreement and for appointment of replacement trustees and issues associated therewith as to which this judge has already made preliminary rulings as to complex matters as well as avoid any issues arising from two judges hearing the same petitions.” 

On January 2, 2020, Bradford D. Lund and the Co-Trustees of The Bradford Disney Lund 1992 Trust, Sherry Lund and Jim Dew filed identical documents entitled “Joint Motion to Reassign Probate Proceeding Back to Probate Division from Civil Division” in each of the five probate cases with the hearing set in Department 1. On January 16, 2020, First Republic Trust Company filed its opposition in each case, and the movants filed their reply on January 23, 2020 in each case. As the motions, oppositions, and replies are identical in all five cases, the court will address them together and refer to the motions collectively as a single motion. 

The earliest-filed probate case, BP055495, was filed in the Los Angeles Superior Court on March 16, 1999. On August 15, 2018, Judge Maria E. Stratton issued an order assigning the five related cases to Judge Cowan for all purposes. The court notes, as argued by First Republic in opposition, moving party Bradford D. Lund has filed two unsuccessful challenges to Judge Cowan within the last four months: an October 16, 2019 challenge pursuant to CCP § 170.1 and a December 27, 2019 challenge pursuant to CCP § 170.6. Accordingly, the instant motion requesting a reassignment of the cases from Judge Cowan’s civil department appears to be an exercise in judge-shopping, particularly in light of Judge Cowan’s January 2, 2020 order that sets forth noting the limited remaining issues upon which he intends to rule. 

Movants note their motion is brought “assuming that matters stayed on appeal can be reassigned to a new department while awaiting appeal.” (Mo. at 7.) Movants provide no authority addressing this issue as Probate Code § 1300(a) defines only one type of appealable probate order. (Prob. Code § 1300(a) (“In all proceedings governed by this code, an appeal may be taken from the making of, or the refusal to make, any of the following orders: (a) Directing, authorizing, approving, or confirming the sale, lease, encumbrance, grant of an option, purchase, conveyance, or exchange of property.”).) However, the administrative reassignment of an action between departments of a superior court does not appear to fall within the scope of the relevant statutes governing stays pending appeal. (CCP §§ 916 et seq; Prob. Code § 1310.)

Movants argue that a civil department lacks jurisdiction to hear a probate matter and cannot handle the complexities of these probate cases. Movants also argue that Judge Cowan’s order violated the Local Rules of the Los Angeles Superior Court, deprived the parties of their right to a court reporter, and failed to honor Movants’ due process rights. Thus, the motion seeks to reverse Judge Cowan’s December 12, 2019 order based upon legal error and asks this court to make contrary findings regarding whether judicial economy is best served by Judge Cowan temporarily retaining these probate cases. Accordingly, the court finds the instant motion constitutes an untimely and improper motion for reconsideration. (CCP § 1008.)

Moreover, neither Department 1, nor any other judicial officer of this court, has the authority to reverse Judge Cowan’s order on the grounds raised by Movants. (Geddes v. Superior Court (2005) 126 Cal.App.4th 417, 425–426 (“one trial judge may not review the ruling of another trial judge because the superior court, although comprised of many judges, is a single court.”); People v. Woodard (1982) 131 Cal.App.3d 107, 111 (“The Superior Court of Los Angeles County, though comprised of a number of judges, is a single court and one member of that court cannot sit in review on the actions of another member of that same court.”).)

The Joint Motion to Reassign Probate Proceeding Back to Probate Division from Civil Division filed in BP055495, BP129815, BP129814, BP119204, and BP119205 is DENIED in its entirety.

Counsel for First Republic Trust Company to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUTUAL OF OMAHA BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST REPUBLIC TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lindsee Blair Falcone