This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:40:51 (UTC).

LUISA MEDINA PENA ET AL. VS. ALFONSO DIAZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 LUISA MEDINA PENA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALFONSO DIAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8643

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PENA LUISA MEDINA

DIAZ AURORA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

DIAZ DIANA

DIAZ ALFONSO

DIAZ ORLANDO

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGKVIST MICHAEL C.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DURAN MANUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; See Memo box below:) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B) WITH THECOURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTIONPURSUANT TO CCP 664.6;*Stipulated Judgment for Quiet Title and Cancellation of Instrmt) - See Memo box below:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Judgment (STIPULATED JUDGMENT FOR QUIET TITLE AND CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by LUISA MEDINA PENA (Legacy Party); AURORA DIAZ (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B) WITH THECOURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTIONPURSUANT TO CCP 664.6;) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B) WITH THECOURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTIONPURSUANT TO CCP 664.6;) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by LUISA MEDINA PENA (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by LUISA MEDINA PENA (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less