This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2019 at 19:41:55 (UTC).

LUIS ESTRADA VS CANON BUILDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/11/2014 LUIS ESTRADA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CANON BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8384

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ESTRADA LUIS

Defendants and Respondents

ALL WAYS PLUMBING INC.

CANON BUILDERS INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OR RAMIN R. YOUNESSI APLC

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GRAY JEREMY J.

COLEMAN FROST LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/16/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.?S DEMURRER ETC.

7/30/2014: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.?S DEMURRER ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/16/2014: NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN LIEU OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

10/29/2014: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN LIEU OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS C

1/30/2015: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS C

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTIIORITWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY REQUESTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND TH

1/30/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTIIORITWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY REQUESTS, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND TH

ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO ESTRADA'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

4/1/2015: ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO ESTRADA'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS I

4/1/2015: ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS I

CANON BUILDERS, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN T

4/1/2015: CANON BUILDERS, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN T

PLAINTIFF LUIS ESTRADA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALWAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST

7/16/2015: PLAINTIFF LUIS ESTRADA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALWAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST

DEFENDANTS CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

7/22/2015: DEFENDANTS CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

ORDER RE: (1) DEFENDANT CANON BUILDERS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC

7/29/2015: ORDER RE: (1) DEFENDANT CANON BUILDERS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC

CANON BUILDERS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; ETC.

10/26/2015: CANON BUILDERS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; ETC.

13K0(W (IF SERVICE OF? PLAL1ILFLS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALL WAY PLUMING, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL FT]RTIIER RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPSOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO.2, AND

1/25/2016: 13K0(W (IF SERVICE OF? PLAL1ILFLS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ALL WAY PLUMING, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL FT]RTIIER RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPSOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO.2, AND

DEFENDANTS' JOINT REPLY ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; AND REQUESTS FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

1/29/2016: DEFENDANTS' JOINT REPLY ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; AND REQUESTS FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC.

4/1/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC.

Minute Order

6/2/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF SAMVEL GESHGIAN IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANTS CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.

11/8/2017: DECLARATION OF SAMVEL GESHGIAN IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANTS CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Canon Builders Inc. (Defendant); All Ways Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SAMVEL GESHGIAN IN ADVANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANTS CANON BUILDERS, INC. AND ALL WAYS PLUMBING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
345 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Luis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Luis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Luis Estrada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL WAYS PLUMBING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAY JEREMY J.