This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2016 at 22:36:25 (UTC).

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT VS CARDEN WHITTIER SCHOOL, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARDEN WHITTIER SCHOOL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3025

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC

Defendants

CARDEN WHITTIER SCHOOL INC. A CA CORP

SERAMZU LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBINO MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorney

MERHAB ROBINSON JACKSON & CLARKSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL 5/30/13 - 6/10/13 AND 6/17/13 - 6/21/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO SERAMZU LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO CARDEN WHITTIER SCHOOL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWELL JOINT SCHOOL DISTRICT A CA PUBLIC is a litigant