This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 23:59:26 (UTC).

LOUIE LEON TURNER VS AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2009 LOUIE LEON TURNER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6750

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LEON TURNER DRYWALL

TURNER LOUIE LEON

Defendants and Respondents

AAC DESIGNERS BUILDERS INC.

ANDERSON AIR CONDITIONING LP

ARCHITECTURAL DOORS INC.

AUSTIN AECOM

BLUE DIAMOND MATERIALS

CREW INC.

DIVISION THREE CONSTRUTION SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

EAST WEST BANK

EDLAND GREG

ELLAND GREG

FARWEST INSULATION CONTRACTING

FENCE FACTORY

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC.

LYNN & MARALD CO. INC.

ONYX PAVING COMPANY INC.

ORANGE COUNTY ERECTORS INC.

PRECISION STAINLESS INC.

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PARKER MICHAEL L. ESQ.

KESSEL ALAN J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SALAMONE MARY A. ESQ.

FLEMING JACK W. ESQ.

VINCENT DIRK L. ESQ.

CRAWFORD & BANGS LAW OFFICES OF

PETERS WILLIAM J. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/12/2016

DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2009

DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: 7-31-09 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2009

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 50, JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (re dismissal of lead caseBC406750 and redesignation of leadcase) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2009

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S ((3) as to case ns. BC403965 08N02176 YC058551 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (document pertains to case N. 08n02176 e p to b i o c. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2009

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S ((THREE) FOR CASE NUMBER BC404046 YC058015 BC406750 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2009

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (atty. Skripko. for plaintiff Anderson Air Conditioning with prejudice/ other: complaint for case NC052351 e p t b i o c ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2009

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) ( ATTY/ WILLIAM J. BEVERLY OTHER: COMPLAINT IN CASE YC058015 E P T B I O C. FOR PLT. G. SLUNAKER, DBA SLUNAKER CONSTRUCTION); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2009

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) ( ATTY/ MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT OTHER: COMPLAINT IN CASE BC404046 E P T B I O C ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2009

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S ((3) ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
04/08/2009

DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2009

DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2009

DocketProof-Service/Summons (SUNRIDER CORPORATION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 25 as thermal logic, inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 24 as weil aquatronics ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 22 as general supply & service inc. dba gexpro ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 26 as robertson's ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 23 as weil aquatronics, inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2009

DocketAmendment to Complaint (doe 21 as cleaver brooks, inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2009

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less