This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 20:17:27 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA VS 5600 ARBOR VITAE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2013 LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 5600 ARBOR VITAE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4917

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPOR-

Defendants and Respondents

5600 ARBOR VITAE LLC

737 LAIRPORT PROPERTY II LLC

8924 BELLANCA LLC

9000 BELLANCA LLC

AIRPORT INDUSTRIAL PROPERTIES INC.

BANK OF EAST ASIA LTD. THE

CALCOUNTIES TITLE NATIONA COMPANY

CALIFORNIA COUNTIES TITLE COMPANY

DTG OPERATIONS INC.

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

GLASCOW LLC

GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATION

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES EXTENSION COMPANY

BANK OF EAST ASIA U.S.A> N.A. THE

APPEL SHELDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRATTLI JOHN F.

SPRINGER JEFFREY Z.B. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ALPER ANDREW K. ESQ.

FRIESS K. ERIK ESQ.

MARGOLIS MIKE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

7/12/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

7/12/2013: COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION; ETC

7/26/2013: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/31/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/31/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/31/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/31/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

8/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

8/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

8/1/2013: GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

8/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/2/2013: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

8/6/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/08/2016

DocketNotice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2016

DocketNOTICE OF RECORDATION OF FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2016

DocketFINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2016

DocketAPPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION; ETC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2016

DocketApplication ; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2016

DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2016

DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2016

DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2016

DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/29/2016

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
07/31/2013

DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2013

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2013

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2013

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2013

DocketNotice; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2013

DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2013

DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2013

DocketCOMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2013

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2013

DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less