Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 21:21:22 (UTC).

LORETTA WILLIAMSON VS DE ROUSSE FAMILY 1999 TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/10/2012 LORETTA WILLIAMSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DE ROUSSE FAMILY 1999 TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, GAIL FEUER, BRIAN F. GASDIA, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, ROGER ITO, ELIA WEINBACH and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2445

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

GAIL FEUER

BRIAN F. GASDIA

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

ROGER ITO

ELIA WEINBACH

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMSON LORETTA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BRADFORD WHITE CORP DOE 3

BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION

DE ROUSSE FAMILY 1999 TRUST

PLUMBING WHOLESALE OUTLET INC DOE 2

TOTAL PLUMBING REPAIR AND DOE 1

TOTAL PLUMBING REPAIR AND SERVICE

PLUMBING WHOLESALE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DE ROUSSE FAMILY 1999 TRUST

ZOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

TOTAL PLUMBING REPAIR AND SERVICE

PLUMBING WHOLESALE

Others

ALDERLAW PC

ROBINSON CALCAGNIE ROBINSON SHAPIRO DAVIS

BELOFSKY DAVID A. LAW OFFICES OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WACKER TED

ALDER C. MICHAEL LAW OFFICES OF

BUTLER TERRENCE L. LAW OFFICES OF

LEE PAUL E.

PC ALDERLAW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHIRINIAN GUY

COX SCOTT

BAKER CHRIS ESQ.

BELOFSKY DAVID A. LAW OFFICES OF

DAVIS ROBINSON CALCAGNIE SHAPIRO

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/3/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

4/12/2013: Minute Order -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

7/11/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

7/11/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/8/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

8/15/2013: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/27/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

9/17/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

LPROPOSED ORDERJ AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC LAND RELATED MOTIONIDISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

5/2/2014: LPROPOSED ORDERJ AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC LAND RELATED MOTIONIDISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

6/4/2014: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

Minute Order -

6/11/2014: Minute Order -

ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

6/11/2014: ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/30/2014: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/8/2014: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2014)

9/9/2014: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2014)

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/26/2014: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

PLUMBING WHOLESALE OUTLET, INC.?S CROSS.COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, EQUITABLE CONTRIBUTION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

9/26/2014: PLUMBING WHOLESALE OUTLET, INC.?S CROSS.COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, EQUITABLE CONTRIBUTION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALC/F 06/08/15) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; CROSS COMPLAINTS DISMISSED PREVIOUSLY;); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LORETTA WILLIAMSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (HEARING TIME ON NOTICE SAYS 9:00 A.M. SHOULD BE 8:30 A.M. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALC/F 05/20/15) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by LORETTA WILLIAMSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
250 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DE ROUSSE FAMILY 1999 TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRADFORD-WHITE CORPORATION A DE CORP. is a litigant