This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2019 at 04:49:07 (UTC).

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ET AL VS DEPT OF HEALTH C

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPT OF HEALTH C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4428

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

KINDRED HOSPITAL-SAN DIEGO

SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

KINDRED HOSPITAL-WESTMINSTER

HOSPITAL-BALDWIN PARK

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC.

KINDRED HOSPITAL-SOUTH BAY

KINDRED HOSPITAL-LOS-ANGELES

KINDRED HOSPITAL-RIVERSIDE

KINDRED HOSPITAL-SAN GABRIEL VALLEY

KINDRED HOSPITAL-LA MIRADA

Respondents and Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEPHENSON ACQUISTO & COL

Defendant Attorney

SNUGSS CARMEN D. DEPUTY ATTY GENERAL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

8/18/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE: TRIAL SEEFING CONFERENCE CONTINUED

2/15/2017: NOTICE: TRIAL SEEFING CONFERENCE CONTINUED

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE; ORDER THEREON

1/30/2017: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE; ORDER THEREON

Minute Order -

12/21/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

10/31/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

9/30/2016: ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

8/24/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

8/18/2016: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/21/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); San Joaquin Community Hospital (Plaintiff); Southern California Specialty Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); San Joaquin Community Hospital (Plaintiff); Southern California Specialty Care, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); San Joaquin Community Hospital (Plaintiff); Southern California Specialty Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); San Joaquin Community Hospital (Plaintiff); Southern California Specialty Care, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Department of Health Care Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL RIVERSIDE is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL-SAN DIEGO is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL-WESTMINSTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LA MIRADA is a litigant