This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 17:52:25 (UTC).

LOLA OLGA DIKAIOU VS FITENESS INTERNATIONAL LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 LOLA OLGA DIKAIOU filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FITENESS INTERNATIONAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8803

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DIKAIOU LOLA OLGA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CONSTRUCTION CLAIMS LAW GROUP

MAHONEY LAW GROUP APC

GAVRIL T. GABRIEL

GABRIEL GAVRIL T.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/27/2015: SUMMONS

CLASS ACUON COMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY ALL WAGES DUE; ETC

7/27/2015: CLASS ACUON COMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY ALL WAGES DUE; ETC

Minute Order

6/2/2016: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

10/4/2016: Notice of Related Case

Substitution of Attorney

10/24/2016: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

11/4/2016: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

11/30/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

2/24/2017: Minute Order

Other -

3/9/2017: Other -

Minute Order

3/20/2017: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

5/24/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration

6/7/2017: Declaration

Status Report

6/16/2017: Status Report

Minute Order

6/21/2017: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

8/3/2017: Stipulation and Order

Demurrer

8/21/2017: Demurrer

Minute Order

8/23/2017: Minute Order

Notice

10/25/2017: Notice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 310; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 310; (Conference-Other; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Notice -NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; DECLARATION OF GAVRIL T. GABLREL IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Lola Olga Dikaiou (Plaintiff); Fitness International, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 310; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Demurrer - without Motion to Strike -JOINT REPORT ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Status Report; Filed by Joined Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 310; (Telephonic Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Stipulation and Order -JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE SET TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lola Olga Dikaiou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Lola Olga Dikaiou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Fitness International, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Lola Olga Dikaiou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Receipt; Filed by Fitness International, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 310; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Lola Olga Dikaiou (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • CLASS ACUON COMPLAINT 1. FAILURE TO PAY ALL WAGES DUE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fitness International, LLC is a litigant