This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 22:21:13 (UTC).

LLOYD BYERS VS SMART STOP SELF STORAGE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/15/2015 LLOYD BYERS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SMART STOP SELF STORAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0720

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYERS LLOYD

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

SMART STOP INC.

SMART STOP SELF STORAGE

STRATEGIC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC

SSTI 12714 S. LA CIENEGA BLVD. LLC

EXTRA SPACE PROPERTIES 112 LLC

SMART STOP SELF STORAGE INC

EXTRA SPACE STORAGE INC.

STRATEGIC STORAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

EXTRA SPACE MANAGEMENT INC.

STRATEGIC STORAGE TRS INC

STRATEGIC STORAGE HOLDINGS LLC

STRATEGIC STORAGE TRS II INC

EXTRA SPACE STORAGE INC

EXTRA SPACE MANAGEMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

MANNING KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal -

10/16/2018: Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal -

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal DISMISSAL FOR APPEAL FILED 8/27/18

10/29/2018: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal DISMISSAL FOR APPEAL FILED 8/27/18

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal DISMISSAL IS FOR APPEAL FILED 8/27/18

10/29/2018: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal DISMISSAL IS FOR APPEAL FILED 8/27/18

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B292431.

1/8/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B292431.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B292431.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (DISMISSAL IS FOR APPEAL FILED 8/27/18); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (DISMISSAL FOR APPEAL FILED 8/27/18); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketNtc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketNtc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by LLOYD BYERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by LLOYD BYERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-10-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LLOYD BYERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by LLOYD BYERS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.