This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2015 at 00:18:04 (UTC).

LINDA WILLIAMS ET AL VS BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2011 LINDA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5517

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACK DEANNA

WILLIAMS KURTIS

WILLIAMS LINDA

Defendants

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

CARRIER CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 500

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC.

EATON CORPORATION FKA CUTLER-HAMMER INC

ERICCSON INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHBACK STEPHEN M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BAKER KEENER & NAHRA LLP

BOOTH MITCHEL & STRANGE LLP

BOWMAN & BROOKE LLP

DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

GORDON & REES LLP

HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG LLP

K&L GATES LLP

MARK B. SCOTT

MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

MURRIN & ASSOCIATES LLC

PERKINS COIE LLP

POND NORTH LLP

PRINDLE AMARO GOETZ HILLYARD & REINHOLTZ

SEDGWICK LLP

SELMAN & BRIETMAN LLP

TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

SUCCESSOR4N-LNTEREST DECLARATION OF LINDA WILLIAMS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 37732

12/19/2011: SUCCESSOR4N-LNTEREST DECLARATION OF LINDA WILLIAMS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 37732

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

2/24/2012: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/22/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/10/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/5/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/5/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/7/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/10/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/6/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/8/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/15/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/28/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/11/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/13/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/30/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/20/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF REJECTION-REQUEST; AS TO DEFT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

6/12/2015: NOTICE OF REJECTION-REQUEST; AS TO DEFT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

NOTICE OF REJECTION-REQUEST; AS TO DEFT NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION

6/12/2015: NOTICE OF REJECTION-REQUEST; AS TO DEFT NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2013
  • Request (for Refund submitted on 02/07/13, was approved on 02/14/13 Submitted by First Legal ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due OSRAM Sylvania ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Dowman Prod ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Metalclad Insuation Corp. ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (Complex fee due Crown Cork & Seal Company ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (Complex fee due Rheem Manufacturing Company ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (Complex fee due General Cable Corporation ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Union Carbide Corp. ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due General Electric ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Schneider Electric USA ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Carrier Corporation ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Crane Co. ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Borgwarner Morse Tec ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Linda Williams ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2011
  • Objection Document (PLNTFFS' OBJ TO PRESUMPTIVE "ADD-ON" TO JCCP CASE NO. 4674 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less